District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:23-cv-02615
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Jan 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC.
Defendant
KENVUE INC.
Defendant
PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Defendant
LTL MANAGEMENT LLC.
Plaintiff
BETH COBB-MATLOCK
Represented By
Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Ashcraft & Gerel, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 04, 2024
6 6 misc Case Transferred Out Thu 01/04 2:24 PM
Case transferred to the USDC for the District of New Jersey pursuant to4 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
misc Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers Fri 01/05 2:05 PM
Receipt on 1/4/2024 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:24-cv-00061 sent by District of New Jersey. (ztth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
5 5 misc EMAIL MDL Thu 01/04 1:59 PM
EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order Thu 01/04 1:55 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-287), dated 1/3/2024, from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Michael A. Shipp for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2738) (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 09/08 12:13 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 09/08 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BETH COBB-MATLOCK. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-02760 and MDL No. 2738. (Parfitt, Michelle)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 8:37 AM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE INC., LTL MANAGEMENT LLC, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10335390) filed by BETH COBB-MATLOCK.(Parfitt, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons JJ,
Att: 3 Summons JJ HoldCo,
Att: 4 Summons LTL,
Att: 5 Summons Janssen,
Att: 6 Summons Kenvue,
Att: 7 Summons PCPC
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/08 11:53 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zljn)
Related: [-]