District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Carl J Nichols
Case #: 1:23-cv-02641
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
UR M. JADDOU
Washington, DC 20529
Represented By
Stephanie R. Johnson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By
Stephanie R. Johnson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By
Stephanie R. Johnson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
Represented By
Stephanie R. Johnson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
PENG SHAO
Represented By
Creighton R. Magid
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/05 11:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 11/15 9:10 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 10/18/2023 (Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 11/15 9:09 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 10/18/2023 (Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 11/15 9:07 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/18/2023 (Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/13 11:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 8, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 13, 2023. (lccjn1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Thu 11/09 5:45 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/09 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 11/07 8:52 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 10/23/2023 (Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Tue 11/07 8:51 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/23. (Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
3 3 order Standing Order Thu 10/05 4:44 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 5, 2023. (lccjn1)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 09/11 11:17 AM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/11 11:10 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10337202) filed by PENG SHAO.(Magid, Creighton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons for Attorney General,
Att: 3 Summons for DHS,
Att: 4 Summons for Jaddou,
Att: 5 Summons for Mayorkas,
Att: 6 Summons for US Attorney for DC,
Att: 7 Summons for USCIS