Nevada District Court
Judge:Carla Baldwin
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00445
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
27 27 minord Minute Order Consent to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/24 9:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/24/2025. By Deputy Clerk: HKL.This case having been referred to a United States Magistrate in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), Local Rule IB 2-1; IT IS ORDERED that the action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:23-cv-00445-CLB. (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
26 26 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/13 4:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 9/9/2025. Motions due by 10/9/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/13/2025. ( For Distribution by law library. ) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form has been sent to parties not receiving electronic service.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Thu 03/13 2:54 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 3/13/2025 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM ; Pla Counsel: Keith Barlow ; Def Counsel: Mark Hackmann ; Recording start and end times: 12:59:43 - 1:21:05 ; Courtroom: 1 ; The parties shall be allowed 180 days from today's date to conduct and complete discovery. A Scheduling Order will be issued that outlines the deadlines that will govern this action. The Court explains the benefits of consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge for the entirety of the case and advises the parties that if they are interested in consenting that they shall complete and return the attached Consent Form to the Clerk's Office for processing. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
24 24 minord Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Wed 03/05 11:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/5/2025. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. In light of a conflict with the calendar of Mr. Hackmann, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 3/13/2025 at 01:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Lead defense counsel shall dial 1-855-244-8681 to be connected into the courtroom for this hearing. The access code is 2319 945 8106 . In addition, counsel for the defendant shall make the necessary arrangements for the Plaintiff's telephonic appearance and shall provide the Courtroom Deputy at lisa_mann@nvd.uscourts.gov with the telephone number at which the Plaintiff can be reached for this mandatory case management conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
23 23 minord Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Mon 03/03 12:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/3/2025. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Due to technical difficulties with the telephone system at High Desert State Prison, the Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2025 at 09:00 AM did not occur. Therefore, the Telephonic Case Management is RESCHEDULED to 3/10/2025 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Lead defense counsel shall dial 1-855-244-8681 to be connected into the courtroom for this hearing. The access code is 2319 945 8106 . In addition, counsel for the defendant shall make the necessary arrangements for the Plaintiff's telephonic appearance and shall provide the Courtroom Deputy at lisa_mann@nvd.uscourts.gov with the telephone number at which the Plaintiff can be reached for this mandatory case management conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
22 22 misc Case Management Report Mon 02/24 3:27 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendants S. Rose, Adams. (Hackmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
21 21 misc Case Management Report Fri 02/21 3:04 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Keith Barlow. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
20 20 5 pgs order Order Mon 02/10 1:04 PM
ORDER SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXCHANGE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES: A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 3/3/2025 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/10/2025. Lead defense counsel shall dial 1-855-244-8681 to be connected into the courtroom for this hearing. The access code is 2319 945 8106 . In addition, counsel for the defendant shall make the necessary arrangements for the Plaintiff's telephonic appearance and shall provide the Courtroom Deputy at lisa_mann@nvd.uscourts.gov with the telephone number at which the Plaintiff can be reached for this mandatory case management conference. At least one-week in advance of the case management conference, each party shall file a case management conference statement. See the attached order for specifications. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/04 4:28 PM
ANSWER to5 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by S. Rose, Adams. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/14/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/6/2025.(Hackmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
18 18 service Acceptance of Service Fri 12/27 10:55 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by S. Rose, Adams on 12/27/2024 executed by S. Rose, Adams re17 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,,,,,,,,,,,. S. Rose accepted service on 12/6/2024, answer due 2/4/2025; Adams accepted service on 12/6/2024, answer due 2/4/2025. Notice Regarding Acceptance of Service (Hackmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/06 12:51 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.1 ) isGRANTED. The Clerk of the Court will send a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office. The Clerk will send a copy of this order to the attention of Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections at formapauperis@doc.nv.gov. (Emailed 12/6/2024). The Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No.5 ) on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada by adding the Attorney General of the State of Nevada to the docket sheet. (E-Service of Order; NEF Regenerated for5 to AG only on 12/6/2024). Service must be perfected within ninety (90) days from the date of this order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Proof of service due by 3/5/2025. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order (12/27/2024), the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff of: (a) the names of the defendants for whom it accepts service; (b) the names of the defendants for whom it does not accept service, and (c) the names of the defendants for whom it is filing the last-known-address information under seal. If the Attorney General accepts service of process for any named defendant(s), such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint (ECF No. 5) within sixty (60) days from the date of this order (2/3/2025). This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/5/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
16 16 minord Minute Order Thu 12/05 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/5/2024. On 6/28/2024 a mediation was held and conducted by mediator Robert Spretnak. At the conclusion of the mediation a settlement had not been reached and the parties were at an impasse. Mr. Spretnak requested time to seek additional information regarding a possible resolution (ECF No. 9 ). Mr. Spretnak was unable to obtain any additional information that would aid in the settlement of this case. As a result, the parties remain at an impasse. It is Therefore Ordered that the Inmate Early Mediation Conference set for Tuesday, 12/17/2024, at 1:00 p.m. is vacated and the case returned to the litigation track. (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
15 15 notice Notice Change of Address Tue 10/22 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Keith Barlow. Address updated to HDSP . (DRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 notice Notice Change of Deputy Attorney General Mon 09/30 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. Deputy Attorney General Andrew Christian Nelson terminated. (Hackmann, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
12 12 10 pgs order Order Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference Fri 09/20 12:02 PM
ORDER Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference for Tuesday, 12/17/2024, at 1:00 p.m. by video conference before Mediator Robert Spretnak. The parties' mediation statements must be received by the court no later than 4:00 p.m., on Tuesday, 12/3/2024. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/20/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MB)
Related: [-]
minord Minute Order Fri 09/20 12:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/20/2024. By Deputy Clerk: M. Brown. In light of the Inmate Early Mediation Conference having been scheduled after the current deadline for the 90-day stay and the 90-day stay report (ECF No.12 ), the stay and the deadline for the report shall be extended to Friday, 12/6/2024 . Until the Court lifts the stay, no other pleadings or papers may be filed in this case, and the parties may not engage in any discovery, nor are the parties required to respond to any paper filed in violation of the stay unless specifically ordered by the Court to do so. IT IS SO ORDERED . (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 09/09 9:04 AM
STATUS REPORT by Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. (Nelson, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Tue 08/06 2:59 PM
STATUS REPORT 90 Day Stay Report by Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. (Nelson, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
minutes Early Mediation Conference Tue 07/02 3:48 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Video Early Mediation Conference held on 6/28/2024 before Mediator Robert Spretnak. Crtrm Administrator: LGM ; Pla Counsel: Keith Barlow ; Def Counsel: Nathan Claus with Nancy Katafias and David Drummond ; Recording start and end times: 2:38:21 - 2:40:03 ; Courtroom: 1 ; 1st mediation session. The parties agree to adjourn this mediation to allow time for the mediator to seek information regarding a resolution. Thereafter, the mediator will contact the Courtroom Deputy to have this mediation rescheduled. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 05/31 11:04 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Keith Barlow. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 10 pgs order Order Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference Wed 05/29 3:44 PM
ORDER Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference for Friday, June 28, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. by video conference before Mediator Robert Spretnak. The parties' mediation statements must be received by the court no later than 4:00 p.m., on Friday, June 14, 2024. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/29/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Limited Notice Appearance of Counsel Wed 05/29 8:56 AM
LIMITED NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew Christian Nelson on behalf of Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. Limited Notice of Appearance (Nelson, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
5 5 cmp Complaint Thu 05/09 9:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Adams, S. Rose (Filing fee $405 NOT paid) by Keith Barlow. Filed pursuant to ECF No.4 Order. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/18/2024. Proof of service due by 8/6/2024. (GA)
Related: [-]
4 4 17 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Screening Order Thu 05/09 9:18 AM
SCREENING ORDER - A decision on the IFP application (ECF No.1 ) is deferred . The Clerk of Court will file the Complaint (ECF No.1 -1) and send Plaintiff a courtesy copy. (Attached hereto for distribution to p via Northern NV CC Law Library). Claims will proceed or dismissed as detailed herein. This action is stayed 90 days to allow parties to settle. 90-day report due by 8/6/2024 . If case does not settle, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee. Clerk is directed to add the Nevada Department of Corrections to the docket as an Interested Party and e-serve a copy of this order, and copy of Plaintiffs FAC on the AG by adding to the docket. (E-service of order & Complaint 5/9/2024). AG shall advise within 21 days of the date of the entry of this order (5/29/2024) re acceptance of service for the purpose of participation in the Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 5/8/2024. (copy of complaint sent to P)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Complaint ECF 1-1
Friday, February 09, 2024
3 3 notice Notice Change of Address Fri 02/09 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address, by Plaintiff Keith Barlow. Old address: ESP. New address: Northern NV CC. (GA)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Fri 09/08 11:42 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DLS)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/08 11:13 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keith Barlow.(DLS) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/8/2023) (DLS). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/8/2023) (DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint