Nevada District Court
Judge:Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01403
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Jul 30, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 11, 2024
16 16 notice Notice Other Fri 10/11 12:54 PM
NOTICE Regarding Disposition of Administrative Record by Kilolo Kijakazi re 15 Minute Order,,. (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
minord Minute Order Fri 10/11 11:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/11/2024. The above-captioned case has been closed as of 7/30/2024. The lodged copies of the administrative record Related [+] are no longer needed by this court. Counsel for the government shall have up to and including 30 days to make arrangements to pick up the administrative record from the clerk's office, or counsel shall file a notice notifying the clerk's office that the administrative record may be discarded. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TG)
Related: [-] ECF No. 7 Notice of Manual Filing
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
14 14 order Judgment Tue 07/30 12:45 PM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.13 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/30/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
13 13 12 pgs order Order on Plaintiff Brief (social security) Order on Countermotion to Affirm the Agency Decision Tue 07/30 12:33 PM
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for remand ECF No.8 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Commissioner's cross motion to affirm ECF No.10 is granted. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/30/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
12 12 respm Reply Brief (for social security cases only) Thu 01/18 4:52 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Commissioner Brief by Plaintiff Craig L. Clove re8 Plaintiff Brief. (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
11 11 respm Response Thu 01/04 4:47 PM
RESPONSE to8 Plaintiff Brief - for social security cases only by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Replies due by 1/11/2024. (Mullen, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Countermotion Affirm the Agency Decision Thu 01/04 4:45 PM
COUNTERMOTION to Affirm the Agency Decision by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 1/18/2024. (Mullen, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
9 9 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 12/12 7:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael James Mullen on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Mullen, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
8 8 motion Plaintiff Brief (for social security cases only) Thu 12/07 3:43 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Plaintiff Craig L. Clove. Responses due by 1/6/2024. (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
7 7 notice Notice Manual Filing in SS Appeal Case Tue 11/07 8:40 AM
NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi re6 Certified Administrative Record.,, Description: Social Security Administrative Record, manually filed with the Magistrate Judge's chambers. (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certified Administrative Record Tue 11/07 8:35 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (CAR) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Electronic access to the CAR is restricted to case participants only.) (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Volume 1
5 5 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 11/07 8:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Blaine T Welsh on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
4 4 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Mon 10/02 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney L. Jamala Edwards on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Edwards, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
3 3 misc Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in SS Case Mon 09/11 10:04 AM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 09/08 12:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Craig L. Clove. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Kijakazi (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7420466) by Craig L. Clove. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/18/2023. Proof of service due by 12/7/2023. CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. In accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636(c), I voluntarily consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this case, including entry of final judgment. I understand that appeal from the judgment shall be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 09/11 10:01 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (AMMi)
Related: [-]