Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:23-cv-01410
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 07, 2024 2:00 AM PST
Defendant
Comenity Capital Bank
Represented By
Joseph P Garin
Lipson Neilson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Synchrony Financial
Represented By
Brittni A. Tanenbaum
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
J Christopher Jorgensen
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Louis Seligman
Represented By
Gerardo Avalos
Freedom Law Firm
contact info
George Haines
Freedom Law Firm, Llc.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Terminated: 02/06/2024
Represented By
Gia Marina
Clark Hill PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 09, 2024
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/10 9:19 AM
ORDER Granting39 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
39 39 motion Stipulation Mon 05/06 2:39 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Synchrony Financial re1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Louis Seligman. (Haines, George) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 03/08 10:20 AM
Comenity Capital Bank and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. terminated per37 ,38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
38 38 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/07 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Louis Seligman. with Comenity Capital Bank . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/07 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Louis Seligman. with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice Other Thu 03/07 1:32 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Synchrony Financial by Louis Seligman re1 Complaint,,.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
minord Minute Order Tue 02/13 4:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on February 13, 2024. WHEREAS plaintiff Louis Seligman filed status reports notifying the court that the parties have reached a settlement. (ECF Nos. 33 , 34 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties file a stipulation to dismiss this case by March 7, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
34 34 misc Status Report Tue 02/06 2:39 PM
STATUS REPORT with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Plaintiff Louis Seligman.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Status Report Tue 02/06 2:33 PM
STATUS REPORT with Comenity Capital Bank by Plaintiff Louis Seligman.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 02/06 1:57 PM
ORDER granting31 Stipulation for Dismissal of Equifax Information Services, LLC with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, disbursements, and attorney fees. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/5/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
31 31 motion Stipulation Thu 02/01 11:21 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Equifax Information Services, LLC re1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Louis Seligman. (Haines, George) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
notice MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Mon 01/08 2:49 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01410-JCM-MDC . (no image attached) (LG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
29 29 misc Status Report Fri 01/05 9:16 AM
STATUS REPORT with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Plaintiff Louis Seligman.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 01/05 9:12 AM
STATUS REPORT with Comenity Capital Bank by Plaintiff Louis Seligman.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
27 27 12 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Tue 01/02 10:13 AM
ORDER Granting26 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/29/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
26 26 motion Stipulated Protective Order Thu 12/28 12:42 PM
Proposed STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant Synchrony Financial.. (Tanenbaum, Brittni)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
25 25 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 12/04 12:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. added.. (Marina, Gia)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/04 12:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Marina, Gia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
22 22 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Order Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order Tue 11/28 10:38 AM
ORDER granting21 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/3/2024. Motions due by 5/3/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 11/28 10:38 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
21 21 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 11/27 3:42 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Louis Seligman.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
minord Minute Order Wed 11/08 4:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on November 8, 2023. WHEREAS, the plaintiff filed notices of settlement as to defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ECF No. 18 ) and Comenity Capital Bank (ECF No. 19 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within sixty days of this order, the plaintiff shall file EITHER stipulations of dismissal for Experian Information Solution, Inc. and Comenity Capital Bank OR a status report apprising the court of what impedes settlement. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
19 19 notice Notice Other Tue 11/07 11:54 AM
NOTICE of settlement with Comenity Capital Bank by Louis Seligman re1 Complaint,,.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
18 18 notice Notice Other Mon 11/06 12:50 PM
NOTICE of settlement with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Louis Seligman re1 Complaint,,.. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Tue 10/31 3:30 PM
ORDER Granting16 Motion to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC. answer due 12/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Tue 10/31 10:53 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to answer re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.. Responses due by 11/14/2023. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
15 15 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 10/06 9:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Synchrony Financial. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Tanenbaum, Brittni)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/06 9:36 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Synchrony Financial. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/16/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/20/2023.(Tanenbaum, Brittni)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/06 9:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Seligman re1 Complaint,,. Synchrony Financial served on 9/18/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/06 9:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Seligman re1 Complaint,,. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/13/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/06 9:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Seligman re1 Complaint,,. Comenity Capital Bank served on 9/14/2023. (Haines, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Fri 09/29 4:06 PM
ORDER Granting8 Motion to Extend Time. Comenity Capital Bank answer due 11/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Fri 09/29 4:04 PM
ORDER Granting7 Motion to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC. answer due 11/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/29/2023) (JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
8 8 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Thu 09/28 1:07 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Comenity Capital Bank. Responses due by 10/12/2023. (Garin, Joseph) (answer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
7 7 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 09/27 4:25 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to answer re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.. Responses due by 10/11/2023. (Marina, Gia) (answer)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 11:47 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Synchrony Financial re1 . (CAH)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 11:46 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc re1 . (CAH)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 11:45 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC re1 . (CAH)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 11:44 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Comenity Capital Bank re1 . (CAH)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 09, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Sat 09/09 1:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Louis Seligman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Avalos, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 09/09 1:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7421285) by Louis Seligman. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/19/2023. Proof of service due by 12/8/2023. (Avalos, Gerardo) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Equifax,
Att: 3 Summons Experian,
Att: 4 Summons Synchrony,
Att: 5 Summons Comenity
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 09/11 11:33 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (CAH)
Related: [-]