District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Christopher R Cooper
Case #: 1:23-cv-02655
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
CVS HEALTH
Represented By
Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY A. GIPSON
1325 Upshur Street NW Apt. 303
Washington, DC 20011

GPO Apr 05 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 10 ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, and dismissing the case without prejudice. See full Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/5/2024. (lccrc3)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 05, 2024
11 11 8 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Fri 04/05 3:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re10 ORDER granting6 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, denying9 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, and dismissing the case without prejudice. See full Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/5/2024. (lccrc3)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 04/05 3:33 PM
ORDER granting6 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, denying9 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, and dismissing the case without prejudice. See full Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/5/2024. (lccrc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
9 9 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 02/13 10:15 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANTHONY A. GIPSON. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
8 8 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 11/28 2:26 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint MOTION to Dismiss filed by CVS HEALTH. (Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
7 7 respm Response to motion Wed 11/22 12:20 PM
RESPONSE re6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANTHONY A. GIPSON. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
order .Order Fox/Neal Order Tue 10/31 9:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's6 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint was due October 30, 2023. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a response by November 21, 2023. Because consideration of this motion could result in dismissal of the case, Plaintiff, proceeding pro se , is advised that, under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the local rules of this Court, the Court may grant the pending motion and dismiss the case if Plaintiff fails to respond within the time provided. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/31/2023. (lccrc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 motion Compel Mon 10/16 2:46 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by CVS HEALTH.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
5 5 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Wed 09/27 9:26 AM
Receipt on 9/26/2023 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2023-CAB-004967. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/14 6:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant's answer or responsive pleading shall be due on or by October 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/14/2023. (lccrc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/13 5:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to Complaint by CVS HEALTH.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Tue 09/12 1:08 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal,(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/12 1:01 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zljn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
2 2 misc Rule 26a1 Statement Mon 09/11 4:24 PM
RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 09/11 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of DC, case number 2023 4967 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-10341486 filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to the Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet