Dixon v. James E. Clyburn
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Sherri A Lydon |
Referred: | Molly H Cherry |
Case #: | 9:23-cv-04500 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 05, 2024 5:19 AM EST |
Defendant
X Corp
f/k/a Twitter, INC. #900 1355 Market Street
San Francisco, CA 94103 |
|
Defendant
James E. Clyburn
|
|
Plaintiff
Gregg Marcel Dixon
3909 Rice Shire
Ridgeland, SC 29936 |
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 08/21 8:46 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Gregg Marcel Dixon.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/27/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (agaz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
41 | 41
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 08/21 8:44 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Motion to Sever and Transfer Response filed by Gregg Marcel Dixon.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/27/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (agaz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Document Mailed
Tue 07/16 12:22 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 39 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Gregg Marcel Dixon 3909 Rice Shire Ridgeland, SC 29936. (agaz, ) |
|
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/16 12:21 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 34 and 35) is hereby extended to August 19, 2024. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 7/16/2024. (agaz, ) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/15 1:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to36 Roseboro Order,35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Motion to Sever and Transfer by Gregg Marcel Dixon. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry. (agaz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 06/28 10:52 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED36 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Gregg Marcel Dixon 3909 Rice Shire Ridgeland, SC 29936. (agaz, ) |
|
36 | 36
order
Roseboro Order
Fri 06/28 10:50 AM
ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to 34 MOTION to Dismiss , 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Motion to Sever and Transfer due by 7/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 6/28/2024. (agaz, ) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 06/27 2:10 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Motion to Sever and Transfer by X Corp. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Wrenn, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents X-Corp's Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit -Declaration of Kenneth M. Trujillo-Jamison | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/25 10:52 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by James E. Clyburn. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Hand, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Patel v. Truist Bank, et al., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Colliton v. Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP | ||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 06/21 12:25 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James E. Clyburn.(Hand, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 06/13 11:50 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 29 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 31 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Gregg Marcel Dixon 3909 Rice Shire Ridgeland, SC 29936. (agaz, ) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 06/13 11:49 AM
TEXT ORDER mooting 12 Motion to Dismiss and 20 Motion to Dismiss. On June 13, 2024, Plaintiff, with leave of the Court, filed an Amended Complaint. See ECF Nos. 29, 30. Accordingly, the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 12 and 20) the initial Complaint are MOOT. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 6/13/2024.(agaz, ) |
|
30 | 30
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/13 11:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against James E. Clyburn, X Corp, filed by Gregg Marcel Dixon. (agaz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 06/13 11:45 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend Complaint. Leave to amend a complaint should be "freely" given "when justice so requires." Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2); see Foreman v. Davis, 371 U.S. 178 (1962); Johnson v. Oroweat Foods Co., 785 F.2d 503, 509 (4th Cir. 1986). Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is hereby GRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to file the proposed Amended Complaint (ECF No. 28) on the docket as the AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendants may answer or otherwise plead in response to the Amended Complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 6/13/2024. (agaz, ) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 06/07 2:17 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Gregg Marcel Dixon. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry. (agaz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 05/17 2:45 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 26 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Gregg Marcel Dixon 3909 Rice Shire Ridgeland, SC 29936. (agaz, ) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/17 2:42 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon consideration of the Motion and Application/Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice, it is ORDERED that Kenneth M. Trujillo-Jamison, who represents Defendant X Corp. f/k/a Twitter, Inc., is granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 5/17/2024.(agaz, ) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/17 11:25 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant Clyburn's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 12) is hereby extended to June 6, 2024. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 5/17/2024.(agaz, ) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Thu 05/16 4:33 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth Trujillo-Jamison ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11769993) by X Corp. Response to Motion due by 5/30/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Wrenn, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Admission of Kenneth Trujillo-Jamison, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/16 10:36 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gregg Marcel Dixon. Response to Motion due by 5/30/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(agaz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Document Mailed
Tue 05/14 10:22 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED21 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Gregg Marcel Dixon 3909 Rice Shire Ridgeland, SC 29936. (agaz, ) |
|
21 | 21
order
Roseboro Order
Tue 05/14 10:20 AM
ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 6/14/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 5/14/2024. (agaz, ) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 05/13 8:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response to Motion due by 5/28/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by X Corp.No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Wrenn, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents X Corp's Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Kenneth M. Trujillo-Jamison | ||
19 | 19
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 05/13 4:23 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by X Corp.(Wrenn, Catherine) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 05/09 10:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Gregg Marcel Dixon.(agaz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Thu 05/09 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg Marcel Dixon. James E. Clyburn served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024; X Corp served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (agaz, ) Modified to edit docket text on 5/9/2024 (agaz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Harpootlian on behalf of James E. Clyburn (Harpootlian, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Document Mailed
Wed 04/17 2:04 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED14 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Gregg Marcel Dixon 3909 Rice Shire Ridgeland, SC 29936. (agaz, ) |
|
14 | 14
order
Roseboro Order
Wed 04/17 2:03 PM
ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 5/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 4/17/2024. (agaz, ) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Document Mailed
Mon 02/12 3:46 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED10 Summons Issued,9 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Gregg Marcel Dixon 3909 Rice Shire Ridgeland, SC 29936. (dgar) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/12 3:44 PM
Summons Issued as to James E. Clyburn, X Corp. Service due by 5/13/2024. (dgar) |
|
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order - Service - Non-Inmate
Mon 02/12 3:42 PM
ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 2/12/2024. (dgar) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 09/11 11:33 AM
Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 200019718. (agaz) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 09/11 11:29 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gregg Marcel Dixon. (agaz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/11 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT against James E. Clyburn, Et Al., X Corp. f/k/a Twitter, Inc, filed by Gregg Marcel Dixon. (agaz) Modified on 9/11/2023 to edit docket text (agaz) |