Jason Scott Hukill v. The State of California et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Stephanie S Christensen |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-01833 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 05, 2024 12:28 AM PST |
Defendant
James Cuellar
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Judge Sean Lafferty
|
|
Defendant
James Neavitt
|
|
Defendant
Office of the United States Bankruptcy Trustee
|
|
Defendant
Karen Rohan
|
|
Defendant
The State of California
|
|
Plaintiff
Jason Scott Hukill
PO Box 4762
Orange, CA 92863 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Wed 05/01 1:28 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals7 filed by Jason Scott Hukill. CCA # 24-268. The order warned appellant that failure to comply would result in the dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk of the Court. To date, appellant has not complied with the court's orders. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. This order served on the district court will, 21 days after the date of the order, act as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Thu 01/18 9:32 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 24-268 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals7 as to Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. (car) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV)
Wed 01/10 3:25 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals7 . (mat) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Wed 01/10 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case6 Filed On: 12/19/23; Entered On: 12/20/23; Filing fee $ 605. Billed. (mat) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 12/20 8:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint for Want of Jurisdiction by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Relief
Fri 12/15 3:06 PM
MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. (twdb) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Fri 09/15 11:41 AM
The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's complaint and filing fee. Although Plaintiff is proceeding without legal representation, Plaintiff still must comply with court orders, the Local Civil Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure including Rule 4 regarding service of the complaint. The Court cannot provide legal advice to any party. There is a free Pro Se Clinic that can provide information and guidance about many aspects of civil litigation in this court. Information about the Pro Se Clinic and a listing of the Local Civil Rules is available on the Courts website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tsn) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 09/11 6:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 09/11 6:19 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
27
pgs
cmp
Complaint - (Referred)
Mon 09/11 6:18 PM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendants James Cuellar, Does, Sean Lafferty, James Neavitt, Office of the United States Bankruptcy Trustee, Karen Rohan, The State of California Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S Christensen.(Filing fee$402:PAID), filed by plaintiff Jason Scott Hukill. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 CV-71 |