Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01425
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County Nevad, A-23-875980-C
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 8:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Bobby C. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By
William H. Pruitt
Barron & Pruitt LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Meservy
Barron & Pruitt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebika Wilson
Represented By
Brian E. Lunt
Edward M. Bernstein & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherman Wilson
Represented By
Brian E. Lunt
Edward M. Bernstein & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/02 3:25 PM
ORDER granting21 Stipulation TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES (Fourth Request). Discovery due by 2/5/2025. Motions due by 3/7/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
21 21 motion Stipulation Tue 10/01 9:14 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re20 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Defendant Bobby C. Pratt, Jr. (Pruitt, William) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Tue 07/30 10:17 AM
ORDER granting18 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 1/6/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 2/5/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/29/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 07/30 10:11 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that defendant Bobby C. Pratt, Jr.s motion for partial dismissal of plaintiffs Sherman Wilson and Rebika Wilsons amended complaint ECF No.17 be, and the same hereby is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claim for negligence per se is dismissed, and their claim for general negligence remains. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation Fri 07/26 4:10 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re16 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Defendant Bobby C. Pratt, Jr. (Pruitt, William) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
17 17 motion Motion Dismiss Wed 07/03 4:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Bobby C. Pratt, Jr. Responses due by 7/17/2024. (Pruitt, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Fri 05/17 11:42 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request). Discovery due by 12/5/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/16/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation Wed 05/15 10:50 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re14 Order on Stipulation,,, by Defendant Bobby C. Pratt, Jr. (Pruitt, William) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 02/16 12:17 PM
ORDER granting13 Stipulation TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES (First Request). Discovery due by 9/6/2024. Motions due by 10/7/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/16/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation Wed 02/14 11:47 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re11 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Defendant Bobby C. Pratt, Jr. (Pruitt, William) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Mon 11/20 10:33 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (GA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 11/20 10:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No.10 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/8/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 11/16 4:20 PM
Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Sherman Wilson.. (Lunt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
minord Minute Order Thu 11/02 12:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/2/2023. Pursuant to Local Rule 26-1, the parties' Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order ("DPSO") was due no later than October 27, 2023. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the parties file a DPSO no later than November 16, 2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 misc Status Report Thu 10/12 1:20 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Bobby C. Pratt, Jr.. (Pruitt, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
7 7 notice Notice Other Wed 10/04 9:28 AM
NOTICE of 26F Conference by Sherman Wilson.. (Lunt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
6 6 misc Statement in Removal Case Mon 09/25 7:43 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Bobby C. Pratt, Jr.. (Pruitt, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 09/18 4:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rebika Wilson, Sherman Wilson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Lunt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 09/12 6:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bobby C. Pratt, Jr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Pruitt, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/12 6:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bobby C. Pratt, Jr. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/22/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/27/2023.(Pruitt, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 minord Minute Order Removal Case Tue 09/12 3:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/12/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/27/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Tue 09/12 12:55 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-23-875980-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7423763) by Bobby C. Pratt, Jr. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/22/2023. (Pruitt, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/12 3:25 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CAH)
Related: [-]