District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Carl J Nichols
Case #: 1:23-cv-02679
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 28, 2023 6:59 AM EDT
Defendant
HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Nathiya Nagendra
Howard University
contact info
Plaintiff
TIFFANY WEBB
Represented By
Charles Theodore Tucker, Jr.
The Cochran Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/08/2023 11:59 PM EST
Friday, December 01, 2023
10 10 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 12/01 6:01 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by HOWARD UNIVERSITY. (Nagendra, Nathiya)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
9 9 12 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 11/24 9:21 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re7 Motion to Dismiss, filed by TIFFANY WEBB. (Tucker, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11/07 2:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of8 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is extended to November 24, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 11/7/2023. (lccjn3)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/06 10:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment by TIFFANY WEBB.(Tucker, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 20, 2023
7 7 motion Dismiss Fri 10/20 5:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment by HOWARD UNIVERSITY.(Nagendra, Nathiya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Wed 10/11 10:06 AM
Receipt on 10/10/2023 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2023-CAB-003487. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/25 11:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File its Responsive Pleading, it is ORDERED that Defendants responsive pleading be filed on or before October 20, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 09/25/2023. (lccjn3)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Fri 09/15 3:14 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by HOWARD UNIVERSITY.(Nagendra, Nathiya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Fri 09/15 1:16 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HOWARD UNIVERSITY (Nagendra, Nathiya)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/15 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathiya Nagendra on behalf of HOWARD UNIVERSITY (Nagendra, Nathiya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
2 2 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Thu 09/14 12:56 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/14 12:54 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 09/13 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of DC, case number 2023 CAB 003487 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-10349121 filed by HOWARD UNIVERSITY.(Nagendra, Nathiya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Superior Court Filings,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet