District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:23-cv-02666
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 09, 2024 3:23 AM EST
Defendant
HASSAN HAMMOUDE
Plaintiff
DERRICK ALLEN
P.O. Box 1227
Durham, NC 27702

GPO Apr 05 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/05/2024. (zsl)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 03, 2025
24 24 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 01/03 11:52 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by DERRICK ALLEN ; USCA Case Number 24-7072 (znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA Judgment 10/15/2024
Monday, July 15, 2024
23 23 appeal Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA Tue 07/23 5:36 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re22 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ;USCA Case Number 24-07072 (zsl)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 07/23 5:35 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/15/2024. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
21 21 appeal Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA Wed 06/12 12:32 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re19 Amended Notice of Appeal ;USCA Case Number 24-7072 (zcb)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 06/12 11:53 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DERRICK ALLEN.(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Envelope of Mailing
19 19 appeal Amended Notice of Appeal Wed 06/12 11:49 AM
Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL re appeal17 by DERRICK ALLEN. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
appeal USCA Case Number Tue 05/14 12:31 PM
USCA Case Number 24-7072 for17 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by DERRICK ALLEN. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
18 18 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 05/01 2:43 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis has been decided re17 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zsl)
Related: [-]
17 17 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Wed 05/01 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to15 Memorandum & Opinion,16 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, by DERRICK ALLEN. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Pro Se Case Tue 04/23 3:06 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified via NEF. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/05/2024. (zsl)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 04/23 3:05 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/05/2024. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 motion Amend/Correct Fri 03/01 4:46 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by DERRICK ALLEN. (Attachment: #1 Amended Complaint)(zsl)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/20 4:35 PM
NOTICE of exhibit by DERRICK ALLEN (zcb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
13 13 motion Amend/Correct Fri 03/01 4:43 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by DERRICK ALLEN. (Attachment: #1 Amended Complaint)(zsl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/07 2:31 PM
ORDER denying as futile8 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying10 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/05/2024. (zljn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
10 10 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 01/05 3:43 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DERRICK ALLEN. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 12/07 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by DERRICK ALLEN (zsl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
8 8 motion Amend/Correct Tue 11/07 11:21 AM
SECOND MOTION to Amend complaint by DERRICK ALLEN.(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
Thursday, October 19, 2023
7 7 notice Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form Fri 10/20 3:17 PM
UPDATED Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by DERRICK ALLEN (zljn)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 10/20 10:23 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice4 Motion to Amend/Correct. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on 10/19/2023. (zljn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Wed 09/13 10:07 AM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/11/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zljn)
Related: [-]