District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Zia M Faruqui
Referred: Zia M Faruqui
Case #: 1:23-cv-02687
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Feb 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
15 15 order .Order Wed 04/24 11:05 AM
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on April 24, 2024. (lcas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation Tue 04/23 4:35 PM
STIPULATION for EAJA attorney fees and costs by KILOLO J. KIJAKAZI.(Elliott, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 15, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment of Reversal Thu 02/15 1:24 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Judgment of Reversal pursuant to the parties'12 joint stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on February 15, 2024. (lcas)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 02/15 12:49 PM
STIPULATION re9 MOTION for Judgment of Reversal by KILOLO J. KIJAKAZI.(Elliott, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 12, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/12 11:48 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's Motion of Judgment of Affirmance and Response to Motion for Judgment of Reversal due by 3/13/2024. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Judgment of Affirmance and Reply to Motion for Judgment of Reversal due by 3/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on February 12, 2024. (lcas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 02/07 1:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Motion for Judgment of Affirmance and In Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment of Reversal by KILOLO J. KIJAKAZI.(Elliott, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
9 9 motion Judgment of Reversal Wed 12/27 2:43 PM
MOTION for Judgment of Reversal by BRENDAN CAMPBELL BURNS.(Chermol, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/29 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Chermol on behalf of BRENDAN CAMPBELL BURNS (Chermol, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/16 5:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: See attached for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on November 16, 2023. (lcas)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes Thu 11/16 2:23 PM
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by KILOLO J. KIJAKAZI.. (Elliott, Scott)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Briefing Schedule Thu 11/16 2:22 PM
PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by KILOLO J. KIJAKAZI.(Elliott, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 11/16 3:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER. With the parties' consent, see Dkts. 5 and 6, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is REFERRED for all purposes to a Magistrate Judge to be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 11/16/2023. (lcar3)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 11/16 3:48 PM
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui for all purposes. (zljn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/14 7:55 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2023. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
order .Order Thu 11/09 8:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed the1 Complaint in this action on September 14, 2023. Defendant filed the4 Administrative Record on November 8, 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before November 27, 2023, advising the Court how they propose to proceed in this matter. Among other things, the Joint Status Report should indicate whether the parties consent to the transfer of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1. The Court emphasizes that the parties may decline to consent to such a referral without any adverse consequences. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 11/9/2023. (lcar3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
4 4 misc Administrative Record- Social Security Wed 11/08 3:19 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by KILOLO J. KIJAKAZI.(Elliott, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2 of 4,
Att: 2 Part 3 of 4,
Att: 3 Part 4 of 4
Monday, October 16, 2023
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/16 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David F. Chermol, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10422087. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRENDAN CAMPBELL BURNS.(Shea, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/16 4:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David F. Chermol is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 10/16/2023. (lcar3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Elliott on behalf of KILOLO J. KIJAKAZI (Elliott, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/14 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10350778) filed by BRENDAN CAMPBELL BURNS.(Shea, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/14 3:37 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zljn)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Thu 09/14 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to KILOLO J. KIJAKAZI Electronic notice has been provided to the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the U.S. Attorney's Office pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405g. (zljn)
Related: [-]