Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01434
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-23-876195-C
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 6:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By
Jerry S. Busby
Cooper Levenson, P.A.
contact info
Andre Marques
Morgan & Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Nelson
Represented By
Paul G. Albright
Naqvi Injury Law
contact info
Farhan R. Naqvi
Naqvi Injury Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
27 27 minord Minute Order Fri 04/18 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/18/2025. Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. filed a notice indicating it has reached a settlement with plaintiff Nancy Nelson. ECF No. 26 . In light of this, it is ordered that a stipulation of dismissal, or a joint status report addressing settlement, is due by May 19, 2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
26 26 notice Notice Other Thu 04/17 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Kumar, Pooja)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/24 11:47 AM
ORDER granting24 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Joint Pre-Trial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/21/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
24 24 motion Stipulation Thu 03/20 11:16 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Kumar, Pooja) (extend) (pretrial)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
23 23 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Wed 01/22 2:10 PM
ORDER granting22 Stipulation. Discovery due by 3/4/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/21/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 motion Stipulation Fri 01/17 3:24 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fifth Request) by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Kumar, Pooja) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
21 21 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Wed 11/13 3:45 PM
ORDER granting20 Stipulation. Discovery due by 1/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation Fri 11/08 3:35 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES [FOURTH REQUEST] by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Kumar, Pooja) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
19 19 misc Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ Mon 07/29 11:14 AM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court regarding assignment of case to Magistrate Judge. (The attached document is restricted to the Office of the Clerk and is not viewable. The filer of this document is also restricted. See General Orders 2023-11 and 2023-12.)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ Mon 07/29 11:13 AM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court regarding assignment of case to Magistrate Judge. (The attached document is restricted to the Office of the Clerk and is not viewable. The filer of this document is also restricted. See General Orders 2023-11 and 2023-12.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
17 17 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Thu 07/25 7:49 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (GA)
Related: [-]
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Thu 07/25 7:47 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES [THIRD REQUEST] Discovery due by 11/12/2024. Motions due by 12/9/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/24/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation Tue 07/23 3:49 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES [THIRD REQUEST] by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Kumar, Pooja) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
14 14 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Tue 04/02 2:23 PM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 9/10/2024. Motions due by 10/10/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation Mon 04/01 4:37 PM
Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES [SECOND REQUEST] by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Kumar, Pooja) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
12 12 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 12/28 10:14 AM
ORDER granting11 Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINES (FIRST REQUEST). Discovery due by 6/12/2024. Motions due by 7/12/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation Tue 12/26 1:43 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Marques, Andre) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 10/17 2:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/12/2024. Motions due by 4/11/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 10/17 2:18 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
8 8 misc Status Report Fri 10/13 12:32 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc... (Busby, Jerry)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 10/13 11:56 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc... (Busby, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 10/11 12:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added.. (Busby, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 09/22 7:22 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nancy Nelson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Albright, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 service Certificate of Service Tue 09/19 8:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc...(Busby, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
3 3 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 09/19 8:32 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc... (Busby, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
2 2 minord Minute Order Removal Case Fri 09/15 9:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 9/15/2023. By Deputy Clerk: R. Gador. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/30/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/15 9:35 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Thu 09/14 12:45 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-876195-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7426728) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/24/2023. (Busby, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet