Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:23-cv-01435
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 6:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Mandalay Bay LLC
Represented By
Scott Pettitt
Mgm Resorts International
contact info
Plaintiff
Wei Liu
Represented By
Qiuxia Castillo
contact info
Trevor J. Hatfield
Hatfield & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
MGM Resort International
Terminated: 02/13/2024
Represented By
Scott Pettitt
Mgm Resorts International
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
57 57 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Mon 01/27 5:20 PM
ORDER. Based on the parties'56 stipulation, this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to close this case. This case is now closed. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/27/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
56 56 motion Stipulation Mon 01/27 9:43 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Defendant Mandalay Bay LLC. (Pettitt, Scott) (dismissal)
Related: [-]