Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01437
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Nov 27, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/15 8:46 AM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the6 IFP is DENIED AS MOOT in this closed case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/14/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
6 6 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/07 3:04 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Travontay Adamson.(GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
Monday, November 27, 2023
5 5 order Judgment Tue 11/28 11:25 AM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants, Davis, Linford, and against Plaintiff, Travontay Adamson. Case dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/28 11:07 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED without prejudice based on the plaintiffs failure to pay the filing fee or seek to proceed in forma pauperis in compliance with the courts order. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/15 11:57 AM
ORDER - IFP Application (ECF No.1 ) is DENIED without prejudice. No later than November 14, 2023 , Plaintiff must either pay the $402 filing fee or file a new fully complete IFP Application. The Clerk of the Court is INSTRUCTED to send Plaintiff the approved IFP application for an inmate and instructions, and retain the complaint (ECF No.1 -1) but not file it at this time. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA HDSP LAW LIBRARY) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/15/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Inmate IFP and Instructions
Thursday, September 14, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 09/14 3:30 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/14 3:22 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Travontay Adamson.(GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint