Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00455
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 09, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/09 2:15 PM
ORDER granting10 Stipulation; Case dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
10 10 motion Stipulation Thu 02/08 2:20 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS re 9 Early Mediation Conference,,,, by Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. (D'Silva, Rudolf) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
minutes Early Mediation Conference Thu 01/18 9:28 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Virtual Early Mediation Conference held on 1/16/2024 before Mediator Elliott Sattler. Crtrm Administrator: LGM ; Pla Counsel: Thomas Sjoberg ; Def Counsel: Rudolf D'Silva with Nancy Katafias and John Henley ; Court Reporter: Donna Prather ; Recording start and end times: 10:59:00 - 11:08:48 ; Courtroom: 1 ; 1st mediation session. A settlement was reached. The terms of the agreement are stated on the record. The agreement was reduced to writing and signed by Mr. Sjoberg at the mediation. Mr. D'Silva will file the stipulation and proposed order of dismissal within 7 days of the NDOC's compliance with the terms of the agreement. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the subject matter during the finalization of the settlement documents, and until the stipulation to dismiss with prejudice is entered. Thereafter, the jurisdiction of the Court shall be terminated. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
8 8 10 pgs order Order Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference Tue 11/28 9:10 AM
ORDER Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference for Tuesday, January 16, 2024, at 8:30 a.m. by video conference before Mediator Elliott Sattler. The parties' mediation statements must be received by the court no later than 4:00 p.m., on Tuesday, January 2, 2024. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
7 7 notice Limited Notice Appearance of Counsel Mon 11/27 11:48 AM
LIMITED NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rudolf Moses D'Silva, I on behalf of Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. (D'Silva, Rudolf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
6 6 notice Notice Other Tue 11/14 4:39 PM
NOTICE for Hearing Accommodations, by Thomas Sjoberg. (GA)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
5 5 5 pgs order Order Mon 11/06 10:36 AM
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, consistent with the Court's screening order (ECF No.3 ), this action will proceed on only the Eighth Amendment claim about indifference to the weather conditions against Sandra Walker. This action is stayed for 90 days to allow parties to settle. 90-day report due by 2/4/2024 . If case does not settle, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee. Clerk is directed to add the Nevada Department of Corrections to the docket as an Interested Party and e-serve a copy of this order, screening order (ECF No.3 ), and copy of the complaint (ECF No.4 ) on the AG by adding to the docket. (E-service of order 11/6/2023; ECF Nos.3 and4 via NEF Regeneration). AG shall advise within 21 days of the date of the entry of this order (11/27/2023) re acceptance of service for the purpose of participation in the Early Mediation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 10/02 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Sandra Walker by Thomas Sjoberg. (Filed pursuant to ECF No.3 screening order). (DLS)
Related: [-]
3 3 10 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Screening Order Mon 10/02 3:18 PM
SCREENING ORDER - A decision on the IFP Application (ECF No.1 ) is deferred. Claims will proceed, or are dismissed as detailed herein. The motion to appoint counsel (ECF No.1 -4) is denied without prejudice. Amended Complaint deadline: 11/1/2023 . The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint (ECF No.1 -1) and send Plaintiff Thomas Sjoberg the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of his Complaint (ECF No.1 -1). (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA NNCC LAW LIBRARY) . Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/2/2023. \(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1983 Complaint Form/Instructions,
Att: 2 Complaint
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 09/14 10:41 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/14 10:28 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Thomas Sjoberg.(GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibits,
Att: 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel