Wilcox v. Garrett
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00457 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nicholas Frank Wilcox. The request for a certificate of appealability (Docket Entry No. 3) is denied. USCA Case No. 23-2897 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() DOCKETING NOTICE USCA, Ninth Circuit : Appellate Case Number 23-2897 assigned to ECF No.8 Notice of Appeal. No briefing schedule will be set until this court and/or the district court determines whether a certificate of appealability (COA) should issue. (DRM) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL by Petitioner Nicholas Frank Wilcox re ECF No.5 Order. Filing fee NOT paid. (PACER Docket Sheet ATTACHED hereto for distribution to P via Lovelock CC Law Library.) E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.(GA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.5 order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
6 | 6
![]() PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Nicholas Frank Wilcox. (Filed and dismissed per ECF No.5 ). (DLS) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER - It is therefore ordered that this action is dismissed with prejudice as time barred. A certificate of appealability is denied, as jurists of reason would not find dismissal of the Petition for the reasons stated herein to be debatable or wrong. It is further ordered that the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 1 ) is granted . It is further ordered that the motion for order to show cause (ECF No. 4 ) is denied . It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court (1) file the Petition (ECF No. 1 -1); (2) add Nevada Attorney General Aaron D. Ford as counsel for Respondents; 2 (3) provide the Nevada Attorney General with copies of the Petition (ECF No. 1 -1), this order, and all other filings in this matter by regenerating the notices of electronic filing (NEF Regenerated for ECF Nos. 1 - 4 to AG only); (4) enter final judgment dismissing this action with prejudice; and (5) close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION for Order to Show Cause re ECF No.3 Order to Show Cause, by Petitioner Nicholas Frank Wilcox. Responses due by 10/18/2023. (GA) (nondispositive) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER to Show Cause : Petitioner Nicholas Frank Wilcox show cause on or before November 17, 2023 , why this action should not be dismissed as untimely. If Wilcox does not timely respond to this order, as detailed herein, the Petition will be dismissed without further advance notice. If Wilcox responds but fails to show with specific, detailed, and competent evidence why the Petition should not be dismissed, the action will be dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE from USDC advising case against Tim Garrett, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:23-cv-00457-MMD-CLB . (GA) |
|
1 | 1
![]() APPLICATION Motion to Proceed in Form of Pauperis (GA) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/15/2023) (GA). Modified on 9/15/2023 to attach IFP application and correct docket text; NEF regenerated (GA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |