District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:23-cv-02705
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
ALISSA L. EMMEL
Represented By
B. Kathryn Debrason
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
UR M. JADDOU
Represented By
B. Kathryn Debrason
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
Represented By
B. Kathryn Debrason
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
PHUONG N. NGUYEN
Represented By
Brandon Meyer
Meyer Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/29 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PHUONG N. NGUYEN (Meyer, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 04/18 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sian Jones on behalf of ALISSA L. EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS Substituting for attorney B. Kathryn Debrason (Jones, Sian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/26 12:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension: Having considered the motion, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint in this action by June 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 26, 2024. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 24, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Sat 02/24 12:10 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ALISSA L. EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS. (Debrason, B.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to Thu 01/11 1:40 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ALISSA L. EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS. (Debrason, B.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/11 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension: Having considered the motion, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the complaint in this action by February 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 11, 2024. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/02 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by B. Kathryn Debrason on behalf of ALISSA L. EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS (Debrason, B.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 12/12 6:04 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALISSA L. EMMEL served on 12/11/2023 (Meyer, Brandon)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 12/12 6:03 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 12/11/2023 (Meyer, Brandon)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 12/12 6:02 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 12/11/2023 (Meyer, Brandon)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Tue 12/12 6:01 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/23. (Meyer, Brandon)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Tue 12/12 6:00 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/13/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/12/2024. (Meyer, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 09/15 2:44 PM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Fri 09/15 2:18 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10355261) filed by PHUONG N. NGUYEN.(Meyer, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons as to Alejandro Mayorkas,
Att: 4 Summons as to Ur M. Jaddou,
Att: 5 Summons as to Alissa L Emmel,
Att: 6 Summons as to U.S Attorney's Office of DC,
Att: 7 Summons as to the Attorney General of the United States
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/15 2:34 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zljn)
Related: [-]