District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Trevor N Mcfadden
Case #: 1:23-cv-02708
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Brendan Thomas Moore
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
CHIP LAITINEN
Represented By
Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Brendan Thomas Moore
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
ALI ROSTAMI
Represented By
Joshua L. Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
10 10 order .Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 12/05 2:44 PM
ORDER re:8 Motion to Dismiss &9 Motion for Extension of Time. See Order for more details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/5/2023. (lctnm3)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/04 5:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's action as moot by ALI ROSTAMI.(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 20, 2023
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 11/20 11:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's action as moot by ANTONY BLINKEN, CHIP LAITINEN. (Moore, Brendan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/20 9:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Government's7 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED. The Government has not complied with the Standing Orders' requirement that requests for extensions of time be filed four business days prior to the relevant deadline. More, the Government has not shown good cause for an extension of time. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(A). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/17/2023. (lctnm3)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/17 4:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, by ANTONY BLINKEN, CHIP LAITINEN. (Moore, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/18 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Molina, Ernesto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Wed 10/11 8:47 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2023. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Wed 10/11 3:43 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY BLINKEN served on 10/10/2023; CHIP LAITINEN served on 10/10/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/2023. (See docket entry4 to view document). (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 order .Order Tue 09/19 4:55 PM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/19/2023. (lctnm3)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 09/19 11:17 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY BLINKEN, CHIP LAITINEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/18 12:29 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Fri 09/15 4:22 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ANTONY BLINKEN, CHIP LAITINEN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10355914) filed by ALI ROSTAMI.(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons