Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01440
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:23-cv-02712
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 3:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Bekins A-1 Movers, Inc.
Represented By
James A. Wescoe
Weber Gallapher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby LLP
contact info
Robert E Schumacher
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bekins Moving Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
James A. Wescoe
Weber Gallapher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby LLP
contact info
Robert E Schumacher
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Erector Sets Inc
Represented By
Willie Pollins
Pollins Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Andrew Henry Pastwick
Law Office Of Andrew H. Pastwick
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, January 06, 2025
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Mon 01/06 1:43 PM
ORDER granting29 Stipulation for Dismissal. IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorneys fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/6/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
29 29 motion Stipulation Fri 01/03 2:15 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Plaintiff Erector Sets Inc. (Pastwick, Andrew) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
28 28 respm Response Fri 12/06 2:29 PM
RESPONSE to26 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff Erector Sets Inc. Replies due by 12/20/2024.(Pastwick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
27 27 motion Motion Sanctions Tue 11/26 3:32 PM
MOTION for Sanctions Defendants Benkins Moving Solutions, Inc. and Bekins A-1 Movers, Inc. dba Bekins Moving Solution's Motion for Spoliation Santions by Defendants Bekins Moving Solutions, Inc., Bekins A-1 Movers, Inc.. (discovery) Responses due by 12/10/2024.(Schumacher, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
26 26 motion Motion Summary Judgment Tue 11/19 4:02 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Bekins Moving Solutions, Inc. and Bekins A-1 Movers, Inc. dba Bekins Moving Solutions' Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Bekins Moving Solutions, Inc., Bekins A-1 Movers, Inc.. Responses due by 12/10/2024.(Schumacher, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Thursday, May 16, 2024
24 24 7 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 05/16 4:32 PM
ORDER granting23 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/19/2024. Motions due by 11/19/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/16/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Thu 05/16 4:32 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
23 23 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 05/15 1:12 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Erector Sets Inc. (Pastwick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
minord Minute Order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 05/03 1:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/3/2024. Re: 21 Discovery Plan and Proposed Scheduling Order. Having reviewed the parties' proposed discovery plan, the Court notes that it is not in compliance with the Local Rules. First, the caption states that it is filed in compliance with LR 26-1(e). Not only is that the incorrect citation, but the plan is not submitted in compliance with LR 26-1. Under LR 26-1(a), if longer deadlines than those provided for in LR 26-1(b) are proposed, "the plan must state on its face 'SPECIAL SCHEDULING REVIEW REQUESTED.'" The parties seek longer deadlines in their plan than those provided for in LR 26-1(b). Second, the parties request longer deadlines than those provided for in LR 26-1(b), but they do not include "a statement of the reasons why longer or different time periods should apply to the case" as required by LR 26-1(a). Third, the parties cite to an outdated version of the Local Rules. As amended over four years ago, the Local Rules no longer require an interim status report deadline and LR 26-4 no longer governs discovery extensions. Fourth, under LR 7-1(e), stipulations must be in the form required by LR IA 6-2, which rule requires that a stipulation include an "order" in the form of a signature block. The parties do not include this signature block on their stipulation. The Court thus DENIES the stipulation. The parties must file an amended stipulation on or before May 17, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
21 21 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 05/02 10:47 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Erector Sets Inc. (Pastwick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
20 20 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Fri 01/19 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert E Schumacher on behalf of Defendants Bekins A-1 Movers, Inc., Bekins Moving Solutions, Inc.. Defendants' Notice of Appearance (Schumacher, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
19 19 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/04 1:22 PM
ORDER granting18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Willie Pollins for Erector Sets, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Andrew H. Pastwick, Esquire. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/4/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 10/04 10:20 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Willie Pollins and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Andrew Pastwick (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7448587) by Plaintiff Erector Sets Inc. (Pastwick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Wed 09/20 7:14 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Willie Pollins and James A. Wescoe to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/4/2023. (no image attached) (KF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
order Standing Order Mon 09/18 3:45 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
15 15 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 09/15 12:32 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-02712. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/15 4:26 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
14 14 ORDER DENYING7 MOTION TO REMAND. THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO USDC NEVADA (LAS VEGAS) AND CLOSED IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/12/23. 9/12/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
13 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BEKINS A-1 MOVERS INC, BEKINS MOVING SOLUTIONS INC. (WESCOE, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER DEFENDANTS SHALL REFILE THE RESPONSE11 WITH THE COMPLETE AFFIDAVIT NO LATER THAN 5:00 P.M. TODAY AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/11/2023. 9/11/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(uh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
11 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BEKINS A-1 MOVERS INC, BEKINS MOVING SOLUTIONS INC. (WESCOE, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
10 10 6 pgs Memorandum in Support of Transfer of this matter to the District of Nevada re8 Order to Show Cause, by BEKINS A-1 MOVERS INC, BEKINS MOVING SOLUTIONS INC. (WESCOE, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
9 9 6 pgs Memorandum of Law Pursuant to 8 25-2023 Order re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court With Certificate of Service filed by ERECTOR SETS INC. (POLLINS, WILLIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
8 8 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL BY 8/30/2023 EITHER STIPULATE TO TRANSFER TO THE DISTRICT OF NEVADA OR MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA OR SHOW CAUSE IN MEMORANDA WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/24/23. 8/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ERECTOR SETS INC.Certificate of Service.(POLLINS, WILLIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 Defendants ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by BEKINS A-1 MOVERS INC, BEKINS MOVING SOLUTIONS INC.(WESCOE, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
5 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BEKINS A-1 MOVERS INC, BEKINS MOVING SOLUTIONS INC. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal (Attorney),,2 Order to Show Cause, .(WESCOE, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Amended Notice of Removal
4 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ERECTOR SETS INC.(POLLINS, WILLIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form Designation,
Att: 4 Case Management Track Form Management Track
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
3 3 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
2 2 ORDER THAT BY 7/24/2023 PLAINTIFF MAY STIPULATE TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DEFENDANTS MAY STIPULATE TO REMAND, DEFENDANTS MAY AMEND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OR EITHER PARTY SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/17/23. 7/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BEKINS A-1 MOVERS INC, BEKINS MOVING SOLUTIONS INC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16815252), filed by BEKINS A-1 MOVERS INC, BEKINS MOVING SOLUTIONS INC.(WESCOE, JAMES) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2023) (sbt). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/17/2023) (sbt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/17/2023) (md). Modified on 7/17/2023 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form,
Att: 4 Designation Form Designation Form