Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01443
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 3:23 AM PDT
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Stephen H. Rogers
Rogers, Mastrangelo, Carvalho & Mitchell
contact info
Plaintiff
Alyssa Nicole Winder
Represented By
Kevin A Sprenz
Sprenz Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 12, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/12 10:48 AM
ORDER Granting5 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
5 5 motion Stipulation Thu 10/05 10:50 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Rogers, Stephen) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 10/03 1:48 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.. (Rogers, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 09/18 10:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/18/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A.Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/3/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 09/15 3:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Rogers, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Fri 09/15 2:53 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-869984-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7428590) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/25/2023. (Rogers, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 09/18 10:51 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (AMMi)
Related: [-]