Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-01446
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Feb 08, 2024
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-23-875386-C
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 3:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Louise Breytenbach
Represented By
Dora V. Lane
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Steven JT Washington
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Defendant
Incorp Services, Inc.
Represented By
Dora V. Lane
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Steven JT Washington
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Defendant
IO Staffing, Inc
Represented By
Steven JT Washington
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Isabel Burgos-Dumani
Represented By
Mary F Chapman
Law Office Of Mary F. Chapman Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 08, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/08 10:53 AM
ORDER Granting30 Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation Wed 02/07 2:36 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS With Prejudice by Defendants IO Staffing, Inc, Incorp Services, Inc.. (Washington, Steven) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 01/05 2:21 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 1/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries ; Pla Counsel: Mary Chapman ; Def Counsel: Dora Lane and Steven Washington ; Recording start and end times: 10:05 - 1:35 ; Courtroom: 3A ; Also present were Isabel Burgos-Dumani and Louise Breytenbach. The court heard presentations from counsel and the parties present and met with each side in caucuses. Offers and counteroffers were exchanged. A settlement was not reached. Counsel may jointly contact the court to request an additional settlement conference if they agree that additional negotiations would be helpful. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
28 28 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Fri 12/29 7:54 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.27 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 6/18/2024 . Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2024 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/18/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
27 27 motion Stipulation Thu 12/28 5:16 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re19 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Defendants IO Staffing, Inc, Incorp Services, Inc.. (Washington, Steven) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
26 26 respm Reply Wed 11/08 12:20 PM
REPLY to Response to16 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Louise Breytenbach, IO Staffing, Inc, Incorp Services, Inc.. (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
25 25 4 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Tue 11/07 10:34 AM
ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT) Modified on 11/7/2023 to correct Magistrate Judge. NEF regenerated - (CT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
23 23 respm Response Wed 11/01 1:40 PM
RESPONSE to16 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Isabel Burgos-Dumani. Replies due by 11/8/2023. (Chapman, Mary)
Related: [-]
notice ENE Notice Wed 11/01 6:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (EDS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
21 21 respm Reply Tue 10/31 1:37 PM
REPLY to Response to16 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Isabel Burgos-Dumani. (Chapman, Mary)
Related: [-]
misc QC Notice Tue 10/31 5:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No.21 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. This is a 'response' to motion and not a 'reply' to motion. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No.21 using the appropriate docket entry title. (no image attached) (CJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 10/24 8:01 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
19 19 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 10/24 7:56 AM
ORDER granting18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/20/2024. Motions due by 4/19/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 10/20 3:25 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Louise Breytenbach, IO Staffing, Inc, Incorp Services, Inc... (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 10/19 4:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by IO Staffing, Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion Dismiss Thu 10/19 3:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss8 Amended Complaint by Defendants Louise Breytenbach, IO Staffing, Inc, Incorp Services, Inc.. Responses due by 11/2/2023. (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/19 2:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by IO Staffing, Inc re12 Summons Issued. IO Staffing, Inc waiver sent on 10/17/2023, answer due 12/16/2023. (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
14 14 misc Status Report Wed 10/18 2:07 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Louise Breytenbach, Incorp Services, Inc... (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 10/06 11:32 AM
ORDER Denying as moot6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/6/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 10/06 9:19 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IO Staffing, Inc re8 Amended Complaint. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
11 11 respm Response Thu 10/05 3:22 PM
RESPONSE to6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Isabel Burgos-Dumani. Replies due by 10/12/2023. (Chapman, Mary)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 10/05 3:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Isabel Burgos-Dumani. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Chapman, Mary)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proposed Summons to be issued Thu 10/05 3:14 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Isabel Burgos-Dumani. (Chapman, Mary)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Complaint Amended Thu 10/05 3:12 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Isabel Burgos-Dumani. Adds new parties. (Chapman, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
7 7 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 09/26 10:54 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Incorp Services, Inc... (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
6 6 motion Motion Dismiss Fri 09/22 2:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Louise Breytenbach, Incorp Services, Inc.. Responses due by 10/6/2023. (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
order Standing Order Tue 09/19 3:29 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 09/18 1:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/18/2023. By Deputy Clerk: C. Smith. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/3/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 09/18 1:33 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 notice Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/15 4:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET to1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Louise Breytenbach, Incorp Services, Inc.. (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 09/15 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Incorp Services, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Fri 09/15 3:58 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, District of Nevada, Case Number A-23-875386-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7428762) by Louise Breytenbach, Incorp Services, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/25/2023. (Washington, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D