California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:23-cv-07734
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Garen Kasparian
Represented By
Vahe V Khojayan
Yk Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
American Contractors Indemnity Company
Represented By
Collin D Cook
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info
Sean T Kingston
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
34 34 judgmentCV Judgment Permanent Injunction Wed 08/14 10:58 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ISSUANCE OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Percy Anderson. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. For a period two years from the date of this Order, Kasparian is enjoined and restrained from, directly or indirectly, and whether alone or in concert with others: a. Using, disclosing, disseminating, distributing, leaking, publishing, selling or transferring to, or sharing with any person whatsoever, any of ACIC's Trade Secrets or Confidential Information in Kasparian's possession, custody, or control, including, but not limited to, the oral disclosure of this information to third parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall constitute Final Judgment as to all claims and parties in the above-captioned litigation, and as no further matters remain pending, shall be dismissed with prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). RE: STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Permanent Injunction33 (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (aco)
Related: [-]
33 33 stip Permanent Injunction Tue 08/13 2:27 PM
STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Permanent Injunction against Defendant Garen Kasparian filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company.(Kingston, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 15, 2024
32 32 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Mon 07/15 8:46 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Daniel A. Platt has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
31 31 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/08 12:38 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of September 23, 2024; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of September 30, 2024; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for November 1, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of December 3, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Thu 03/07 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the incorrect date for the Final Pretrial Conference is in the docket entry. The correct date is 11/01/24 at 1:30 p.m. Re: MINUTES IN CHAMBERS,29 (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
29 29 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/07 8:52 AM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 03/07/2024, SEE DOC NO. 30] MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for March 11, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. This case is referred to the Court's Mediation Panel. Final Pretrial Conference 11/02/24 at 1:30 p.m. Jury Trial 12/03/24 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco) Modified on 3/7/2024 (aco)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Thu 03/07 8:47 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 7, 2024. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
27 27 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 02/26 4:40 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Joint 16(B) report ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company.. (Kingston, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/25 4:15 PM
Notice of Scheduling Meeting of Counsel and Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Kingston, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
25 25 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 01/22 12:57 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for March 11, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 01/19 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Garen Kasparian, (Khojayan, Vahe)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/19 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition16 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Garen Kasparian.(Khojayan, Vahe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
22 22 order Dismiss Case Thu 01/04 4:41 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for January 8, 2024, is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court denies Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file an Answer to Plaintiff's FAC Complaint by no later than January 19, 2024. (See document for further details).; denying18 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (aco)
Related: [-]
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/04 12:09 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER ADVISEMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. A hearing on the Motion to Dismiss18 is scheduled for January 8, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for January 8, 2024, is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
20 20 respm Reply (Motion related) Tue 12/26 7:19 PM
REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Garen Kasparian. (Khojayan, Vahe)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/18 5:37 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Kingston, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
18 18 motion Dismiss Case Mon 12/11 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Garen Kasparian. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Khojayan, Vahe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 11/28 4:08 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean T Kingston counsel for Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company. Adding Sean T. Kingston as counsel of record for American Contractors Indemnity Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Attorney Sean T Kingston added to party American Contractors Indemnity Company(pty:pla))(Kingston, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
16 16 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 11/20 6:25 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Garen Kasparian All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company(Cook, Collin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, October 20, 2023
15 15 misc Miscellaneous Document Fri 10/20 11:16 AM
Plaintiff's Designation of Trade Secrets Pursuant to C.C.P. section 2019.210 filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company (Kingston, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
14 14 notice Appearance Thu 10/12 6:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vahe V Khojayan on behalf of Defendant Garen Kasparian (Attorney Vahe V Khojayan added to party Garen Kasparian(pty:dft))(Khojayan, Vahe)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/06 5:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company. upon Garen Kasparian waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/22/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Vahe Khojayan. (Kingston, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 09/21 10:28 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court finds that identification of the trade secrets at issue, as required by section 2019.210, is appropriate and necessary for the orderly prosecution of Plaintiff's trade secret claims. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to file on or before October 20, 2023, a statement identifying with particularity the trade secrets that Defendant allegedly misappropriated. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 4:23 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Garen Kasparian. (aco)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Summons Request Tue 09/19 2:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Cook, Collin)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 09/19 1:24 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 09/18 6:12 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Garen Kasparian. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 09/18 5:53 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 09/18 5:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 09/18 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 09/15 5:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation, identifying Surety Associates Holding Co., Inc.; HCC Insurance Holdings. Inc.; Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd.; Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc.. (Cook, Collin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 09/15 5:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation. (Cook, Collin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 09/15 4:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation. (Cook, Collin)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/15 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36052395 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation. (Attorney Collin D Cook added to party AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation(pty:bkmov))(Cook, Collin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A