Roberts v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04631 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 1:23-cv-22895 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 9:36 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Jeremi Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Respondent
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Respondent
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Respondent
Ten Cate Protective Fabrics USA
|
|
Respondent
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Respondent
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Respondent
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Respondent
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Respondent
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Respondent
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Respondent
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Respondent
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Respondent
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Respondent
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Respondent
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Respondent
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Respondent
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Respondent
Corteva Inc
|
|
Respondent
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Respondent
Buckeye Fire Equipment
|
|
Respondent
Arkema Inc
|
|
Respondent
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Respondent
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Respondent
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Respondent
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 08/12 6:37 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. as listed in Motions. The Court GRANTS 5393 Motion of Samuel Gittle to Withdraw as Attorney; 5394 Motion of Aaron Modiano to Withdraw as Attorney; 5395 Motion of Aaron Modiano to Withdraw as Attorney; for plaintiffs as listed in motions (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (25) in case 2:22-cv-00027-RMG; (23) in case 2:23-cv-04631-RMG; (11) in case 2:23-cv-06853-RMG; (13) in case 2:23-cv-06854-RMG; (11) in case 2:24-cv-00016-RMG; (12) in case 2:24-cv-00150-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-01538-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-01729-RMG; (16) in case 2:24-cv-02468-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-01996-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-01997-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-02190-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-02418-RMG; (27) in case 2:24-cv-03008-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-02437-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-02442-RMG; (9) in case 2:24-cv-02441-RMG; (5) in case 2:24-cv-02265-RMG; (5) in case 2:24-cv-02270-RMG). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/12/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 07/25 8:20 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Aaron Modiano by Ahmanda Christine Diaz, Robert Alexander Oberst, Ronald Daniel Earl, George Odell, Tammy Paschall, Sabrina Gayle Nelson, Howard R Hampson, Kelli L. Maue, Dawn Michelle Patton, Shellie Lynn Mathon, Janice Johnson, Robert Johnson, Jeremi Roberts, Suzanne Ellison Spak. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Durkee, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles David Durkee on behalf of Ahmanda Christine Diaz, Robert Alexander Oberst, Ronald Daniel Earl, George Odell, Tammy Paschall, Sabrina Gayle Nelson, Howard R Hampson, Kelli L. Maue, Dawn Michelle Patton, Shellie Lynn Mathon, Janice Johnson, Robert Johnson, Jeremi Roberts, Suzanne Ellison Spak Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Durkee, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 06/11 3:43 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos.: granting 5070 ; 5087 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (21) in case 2:22-cv-00027-RMG; (18) in case 2:23-cv-04631-RMG) Motion to Withdraw Elsa De Lima as Attorney for plaintiffs. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/11/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00027-RMG, 2:23-cv-04631-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 06/04 3:37 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elsa De Lima by Jeremi Roberts. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04631-RMG(Modiano, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/30 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Richard Modiano on behalf of Jeremi Roberts (Modiano, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/21 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Larey on behalf of Jeremi Roberts (Larey, Jason) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Entry Deletion
Mon 09/18 9:55 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 3686, 11 Reason: Filing user filed incorrect document as unnecessary event (notice of appearance) Filing date of original filing: 9/15/2023 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04631-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/15 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elsa De Lima on behalf of Jeremi Roberts Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04631-RMG(De Lima, Elsa) |
|
10 | 10
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 09/15 3:10 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Southern (associated as of 9/14/2023), 1:23-cv-22895, Roberts v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04631-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 09/15 3:08 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-22895. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-148) transferring case to the District of South Carolina (Charleston) re: MDL 18-mn-2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel.. (Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel). (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/15/2023.] | |
6 | 6 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-148) transferring case to the District of South Carolina (Charleston) re: MDL 18-mn-2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel). (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/15/2023.] | |
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Elsa De Lima re4 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Elsa De Lima has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions.[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information] (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/15/2023.] | |
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Elsa De Lima (De Lima, Elsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/15/2023.] | |
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE, for statistical purposes only, without prejudice to the substantive rights of any of the parties. Any party may move to reopen this case at the appropriate time. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (wc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/15/2023.] | |
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/15/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16816138, filed by 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc. No Answer / Motion to Dismiss Filed.(Klein, Jonathan) Modified text & attachment description on 8/4/2023 (rbe). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/15/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |