New Jersey District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00740
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 3:45 AM EDT
Defendant
EMMANUEL RIVERA (2)
Represented By
KELLY ANDERSON SMITH
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
VINAY S. LIMBACHIA
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2024 2:20 PM EDT
Monday, July 25, 2022
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to HERBY DESIR (1), EMMANUEL RIVERA (2). (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
Arrest of HERBY DESIR, EMMANUEL RIVERA. (LM, ) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: KELLY A. SMITH appearing for EMMANUEL RIVERA. (LM, ) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre:Initial Appearance as to EMMANUEL RIVERA held on 8/5/2022; deft. advised of rights; consent to detention; order of detention, etc. (LM, ) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to EMMANUEL RIVERA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/5/22. (LM, ) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs BRADY ORDER as to EMMANUEL RIVERA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/5/22. (LM, ) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
11 11 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to HERBY DESIR, EMMANUEL RIVERA Time excluded from 8/8/2022 until 9/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 8/8/2022. (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: KELLY A. SMITH appearing for EMMANUEL RIVERA (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
13 13 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EMMANUEL RIVERA Time excluded from 9/28/2022 until 11/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/28/2022. (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
15 15 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to HERBY DESIR, EMMANUEL RIVERA Time excluded from 11/23/2022 until 1/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/23/2022. (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
16 16 5 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to HERBY DESIR, EMMANUEL RIVERA Time excluded from 2/1/2023 until 4/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/1/2023. (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
17 17 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to HERBY DESIR Time excluded from 3/24/2023 until 5/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/24/2023. (spc) (Main Document 17 replaced on 4/24/2023) (spc). [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EMMANUEL RIVERA Time excluded from 3/24/2023 until 5/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/24/2023. (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
19 19 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EMMANUEL RIVERA Time excluded from 5/31/2023 until 7/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/23/2023. (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
21 21 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EMMANUEL RIVERA Time excluded from 7/25/2023 until 9/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/25/2023. (spc) [2:22-mj-11185-AME]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
22 22 5 pgs INFORMATION as to EMMANUEL RIVERA (2) count(s) 1, 2. (nar) (Main Document 22 replaced on 9/15/2023) (nar).
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by EMMANUEL RIVERA (nar)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen M. Williams: Initial Appearance as to EMMANUEL RIVERA held on 9/15/2023. Plea Agreement Hearing as to EMMANUEL RIVERA held on 9/15/2023. PLEA: GUILTY TO A TWO COUNT INFORMATION. Sentencing set for 1/18/2024 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4A before Judge Karen M. Williams. Ordered condition of detention shall continue. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Court Reporter/Recorder Sharon Ricci (267-249-8780).) (nar)
Related: [-]
25 25 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to EMMANUEL RIVERA. (nar)
Related: [-]
26 26 9 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to EMMANUEL RIVERA (nar)
Related: [-]