Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01454
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District, A-23-873635-C
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 3:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Albertson's LLC
Represented By
Dallin Knecht
contact info
Bailee Raquel Reese
Backus Burden
contact info
Jack P. Burden
Backus Carranza
contact info
Plaintiff
Debbie Kay Ferre
Represented By
Boyd B Moss, III
Moss Berg Injury Lawyers
contact info
John C. Funk
Moss Berg Injury Lawyers
contact info
Marcus Alan Berg
Moss Berg Injury Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/10 8:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE on19 Stipulation : ORDERED that all claims that have been brought and/or could have been brought by Plaintiff against Defendant in the above-titled litigation are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This stipulated dismissal DOES resolve the entire matter. Each party to this dismissal is to bear their own respective attorney's fees and costs incurred herein. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Stipulation Wed 10/09 2:51 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Burden, Jack) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Wed 07/17 10:27 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (RJDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
17 17 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Wed 07/17 10:26 AM
ORDER Granting16 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 9/13/2024. Motions due by 10/13/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/16/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
16 16 motion Stipulation Mon 07/15 4:58 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re13 Order on Stipulation,,, by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Burden, Jack) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
15 15 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/11 11:34 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting14 Stipulation for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/11/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation Fri 03/08 12:04 PM
STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Knecht, Dallin) (other) (protective)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/04 12:25 PM
ORDER Granting12 Stipulation for Extension of Time re10 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/15/2024. Motions due by 8/13/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation Thu 02/29 10:21 AM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re10 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Knecht, Dallin) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
11 11 notice Notice Change of Address Fri 01/05 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Boyd B Moss, III. (Moss, Boyd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
10 10 6 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 10/31 4:40 PM
ORDER granting9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/15/2024. Motions due by 6/14/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
9 9 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 10/30 10:22 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Debbie Kay Ferre.. (Moss, Boyd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
8 8 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 09/28 11:35 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Albertson's LLC.. (Knecht, Dallin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
7 7 notice Notice Other Wed 09/20 9:36 AM
NOTICE by Albertson's LLC re4 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Burden, Jack)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 09/20 9:33 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Albertson's LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Albertson's Companies, Inc. (DE; ID), Corporate Parent Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Albertson's LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate ABS NV-O, LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Safeway Inc. (DE; CA), Other Affiliate Albertson's Safeway LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's Holdings LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's Stores Sub LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC (DE; ID) for Albertson's LLC added.. (Burden, Jack)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Wed 09/20 7:52 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Tue 09/19 9:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/19/2023. By Deputy Clerk: R. Gador. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/4/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 09/19 10:26 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Debbie Kay Ferre. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Berg, Marcus)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 09/19 10:17 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Debbie Kay Ferre. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Berg, Marcus)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/19 9:16 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Mon 09/18 4:21 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-23=873635-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7430461) by Albertson's LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/28/2023. (Burden, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Index Index of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E