Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mitchell S Goldberg
Case #: 2:23-cv-03627
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 10:57 AM EDT
Defendant
CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By
JANICE G. DUBLER
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
JACQUELINE R. BARRETT
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEM/JASON CORRAGGIO
Represented By
STEPHANIE J. MENSING
Mensing Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 08, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Thu 08/08 9:56 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/8/24. 8/8/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
29 29 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 08/08 9:00 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSE R. ARTEAGA Settlement Conference held on 8/7/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
28 28 minutes Status Conference Thu 08/01 1:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Status Conference held on 8/1/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/01 11:08 AM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINES IS GRANTED AND THE DEADLINE FOR FACT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO 11/4/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/1/24. 8/1/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 08/01 11:09 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/4/2024. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/30 1:09 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE: A Status Conference in the above-captioned matter is scheduled for Thursday, August 1, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be conducted via telephone. Counsel are directed to dial in as follows: (1) Call: 888-684-8852; (2) Enter access code: 2187450#; (3) Press # to enter as a participant(smcc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation Mon 07/29 5:01 PM
STIPULATION re22 Scheduling Order, (Joint) for Extension of Time to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (BARRETT, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Thu 07/18 8:53 AM
ORDER THAT NEIL V. MCKITTRICK APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/17/24. 7/18/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
23 23 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 07/10 2:58 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil V. McKittrick by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17591724.). (BARRETT, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/30 3:01 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/30/24. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 10/14/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/30/24. 5/30/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation Wed 05/29 9:33 AM
STIPULATION re9 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement, by JEM/JASON CORRAGGIO. (MENSING, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/30 8:38 AM
AMENDED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 8/7/24 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 3H; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSE R. ARTEAGA ON 4/29/24. 4/30/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 03/21 1:37 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE17 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/21/24.3/21/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 03/21 1:34 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE16 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/21/24.3/21/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 03/21 9:20 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Cheyna H. Galloway ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17344862.) filed by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(DUBLER, JANICE)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 03/21 9:18 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Margaret R. Foss ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17344833.) filed by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(DUBLER, JANICE)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/15 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JANICE G. DUBLER on behalf of CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(DUBLER, JANICE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/15 7:48 AM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES "JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXTEND ALL DEADLINES" IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND MAY BE REFILED, IF NEEDED, CLOSER TO THE CURRENT FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE OF 6/4/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/14/24. 3/15/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation Wed 03/13 11:47 AM
STIPULATION re9 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement, Requesting Extension of Time by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION.(BARRETT, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 11, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation Mon 03/11 3:25 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) Discovery Confidentiality Order by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (BARRETT, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/19 2:52 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/18/24 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 3 H; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSE R. ARTEAGA ON 1/19/24. 1/19/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
10 10 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Thu 01/04 5:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 1/4/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Thu 01/04 5:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSE ARTEGA FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 7/30/24. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 8/13/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/4/24. 1/4/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/28 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/4/2024 AT 2:00 PM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. COUNSEL SHOULD DIAL IN AS DIRECTED IN THE NOTICE. ENTERED 11/28/2023 AND E-MAILED. (sl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
7 7 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 11/20 3:22 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION.(BARRETT, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/20 3:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION.(BARRETT, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/22 3:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEM/JASON CORRAGGIO. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 9/21/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (MENSING, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
4 4 service Request for Waiver of Service Thu 09/21 7:54 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Capital One Financial Corporation on 9/21/2023 by JEM/JASON CORRAGGIO. Waiver of Service due by 10/23/2023. (MENSING, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/20 3:33 PM
12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 6:03 PM
Summons Issued as to CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/19/23 (JL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 09/19 9:47 AM
COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16953154.), filed by JEM/JASON CORRAGGIO.(MENSING, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form