Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-24533
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 10:45 AM EDT
Defendant
HANKS FURNITURE INC
Represented By
KAYLA NICOLE RYAN
Cole Scott & Kissane Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Cole Scott & Kissane Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
BARRY ADAM POSTMAN
Cole Scott & Kissane Pa - West Palm Beach Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By
MARSHA RUCKER
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission - Birmingham Al
contact info
BARBARA J WELLS
Equal Employment Opportunity Comm - Birmingham Al
contact info
GERALD LEE MILLER
Equal Employment Opportunity Comm - Birmingham Al
contact info
DEBORAH A MANN
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
BRYAN ANDREW GRAYSON
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
BENJAMIN GARRETT CAIN
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 18, 2024
42 42 17 pgs CONSENT DECREE. The EEOC and HFI willingly enter into this Decree in order to resolve all issues between them in the EEOC's Complaint in Civil Action No. 3:23-cv- 24533-MCR-HTC. This Decree shall be final and binding between the EEOC and HFI. This Decree shall be filed in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida, Pensacola Division, and shall be in effect for a period of three (3) years from the date of entry of this Decree by the Court. (SEE FULL ORDER) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/18/24. (Case is now closed) (jfj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:41 Joint MOTION for Settlement by Entry of Executed Consent Decree. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
41 41 3 pgs Joint MOTION for Settlement by Entry of Executed Consent Decree by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit Consent Decree
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
40 40 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON:Settlement Conference held on 7/2/2024. Settlement reached. Motion for entry of executed consent decree to be filed within fourteen (14) days. (Court Reporter DCR) (kli)
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines/Hearings re40 Settlement Conference Deadline to file executed decree 7/16/2024 . (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
39 39 ORDER re 38 Order. A settlement conference will be held before the undersigned on July 2, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (CDT) in Courtroom 3 North of the United States District Courthouse, One North Palafox Street, Pensacola, Florida 32502. For this conference to have a reasonable chance of success, counsel and the parties must carefully review, and comply with, the remainder of this Order. Failure to follow this Order may result in sanctions being imposed on the parties, on counsel, or on both. (Please see order.)Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 05/30/2024. ( Settlement Conference set for 7/2/2024) (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
38 38 ORDER re 36 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines and MOTION for Mediation referral to Magistrate Judge. This case is STAYED by consent of the parties until July 31, 2024. The case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Hope T. Cannon pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) for a settlement conference to be scheduled and conducted no later than July 31, 2024. See also N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 72.3. The Clerk is directed to refer the case to the undersigned when the Magistrate Judge files a report of the results of that conference. The parties must notify the Court no later than July 31, 2024, whether the case settles or is ready to proceed. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/29/2024. (Deadline to notify District Judge 7/31/2024 . Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 7/31/2024 .) Set/Clear Flags. (alb)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:37 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses. (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
37 37 11 pgs DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANSWER to28 Amended Complaint by HANKS FURNITURE INC. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:36 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Joint MOTION for Mediation referral to Magistrate Judge. (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
36 36 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines , Joint MOTION for Mediation referral to Magistrate Judge ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/6/2024) .) by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
35 35 17 pgs ORDER. Defendant HFI's Motion to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement (ECF No. 30 ) is DENIED. HFI's responsive pleading to the FAC is due fourteen (14) days after the date of this Order. Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4)(A). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/14/2024. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/28/2024) . (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
34 34 ORDER. The 33 motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's expert disclosure deadline is extended to May 30, 2024 and Defendants expert disclosure deadline is extended to July 1, 2024. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 04/24/2024. (alb)
Related: [-]
33 33 MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Deadlines by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:33 MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Deadlines. (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
32 32 NOTICE of Appearance by CARL M CHANG on behalf of EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (CHANG, CARL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:31 Response in Opposition to Motion,30 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
31 31 19 pgs RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
30 30 18 pgs MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by HANKS FURNITURE INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/11/2024) . (KELLY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:29 JOINT NOTICE REGARDING PARTIES' ESI PROTOCOL STIPULATION. (jfj)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
29 29 NOTICE regarding Joint Status of ESI Stipulation by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
28 28 11 pgs First AMENDED COMPLAINT against HANKS FURNITURE INC, filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:28 Amended Complaint. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
27 27 2 pgs ORDER re 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint fourteen days from the date of this Order. ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2024 .) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 03/01/2024. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM,26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
26 26 16 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
25 25 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL, Re: 20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Discovery due by 8/30/2024 . Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/20/2024 . Mediation to take place by 9/27/2024 . Mediation Report due by 10/11/2024 .) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 02/15/2024. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:24 PLAINTIFF EEOC'S NOTICE REGARDINGPARTIES' ESI PROTOCOL STIPULATION. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
24 24 NOTICE Regarding to ESI Protocol Stipulation by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
23 23 26 pgs MOTION to Dismiss for Failure To State A Claim TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND/OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by HANKS FURNITURE INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/23/2024) . (KELLY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
22 22 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN GARRETT CAIN on behalf of EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (CAIN, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
21 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Barbara J. Wells is relieved of further obligation to represent Plaintiff in this matter. Plaintiff continues to be represented by Attorneys Bryan Andrew Grayson, Deborah A. Mann and Marsha Rucker. The Clerk is directed to update the docket accordingly. Attorney BARBARA J WELLS terminated Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 01/26/2024. (alb)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
20 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
19 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (WELLS, BARBARA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
18 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gerald L. Miller is relieved of further obligation to represent Plaintiff in this matter. Plaintiff continues to be represented by Attorneys Barbara J. Wells, Bryan Andrew Grayson, Deborah A. Mann and Marsha Rucker. The Clerk is directed to update the docket accordingly. Attorney GERALD LEE MILLER terminated Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 01/02/2024. (alb)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Gerald Miller. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
17 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Gerald Miller by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (MILLER, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
16 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HANKS FURNITURE INC. (RYAN, KAYLA)
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE of Appearance by KAYLA NICOLE RYAN on behalf of HANKS FURNITURE INC (RYAN, KAYLA)
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY on behalf of HANKS FURNITURE INC (KELLY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
13 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/29/2023 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/29 /2024 . Discovery due by 6/11/2024 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/15/2023. (alb)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/15/2023. (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:11 Notice of Appearance. (Proposed ISO prepared.) (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY on behalf of HANKS FURNITURE INC (KELLY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. HANKS FURNITURE INC waiver sent on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (RUCKER, MARSHA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
9 9 Summons Issued as to HANKS FURNITURE INC. (alb)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Summons in a Civil Action to be Issued by Clerk by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (RUCKER, MARSHA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
7 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jim Johnson, Registered Agent for Hank's Furniture, Inc. on 11/06/2023 by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. Waiver of Service due by 12/6/2023 . (RUCKER, MARSHA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BARBARA J WELLS on behalf of EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (WELLS, BARBARA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH A MANN on behalf of EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (MANN, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN ANDREW GRAYSON on behalf of EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (GRAYSON, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD LEE MILLER on behalf of EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (MILLER, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action. (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT against HANKS FURNITURE, INC., filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (RUCKER, MARSHA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet