Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00194
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Jan 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 3:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Does
Represented By
Joshua A. Newton
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Scott Renner
Represented By
Joshua A. Newton
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Joshua A. Newton
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of State
Represented By
Joshua A. Newton
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Reinier Gesto Borroto
Represented By
David Gluckman
Mccandlish Holton
contact info
Plaintiff
Argelia Lorence
Represented By
David Gluckman
Mccandlish Holton
contact info

GPO Dec 27 2023
ORDER of Recusal directing the Clerk to reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/27/2023. (jak)
GPO Jan 26 2024
ORDER dismissing 1 complaint without prejudice; finding as moot 3 and 5 motions; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/26/2024. (jak)
GPO Jan 26 2024
JUDGMENT based on 11 Order, plaintiff's claim against defendants is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/26/2024. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, January 26, 2024
12 12 order Judgment Fri 01/26 1:46 PM
JUDGMENT based on11 Order, plaintiff's claim against defendants is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/26/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/26 1:44 PM
ORDER dismissing1 complaint without prejudice; finding as moot3 and5 motions; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/26/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/26 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Reinier Gesto Borroto, Argelia Lorence (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
9 9 misc Notice of Reassignment Wed 12/27 10:34 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 12/27 10:21 AM
ORDER of Recusal directing the Clerk to reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/27/2023. (jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/26 3:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Reinier Gesto Borroto and Argelia Lorence. (wbb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 09, 2023
6 6 brief Brief in Support Sat 12/09 3:57 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by All Defendants. (Newton, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Sat 12/09 3:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by All Defendants(Newton, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Samuel McDonald
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 12/09 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Newton on behalf of All Defendants (Newton, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
3 3 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 12/04 2:17 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Reinier Gesto Borroto (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
2 2 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 10/27 10:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reinier Gesto Borroto. All Defendants. (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/20 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Reinier Gesto Borroto. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON195. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service.(wbb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet