Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Joe J Volpe
Referred: Joe J Volpe
Case #: 4:23-cv-00878
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Apr 02, 2024
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Apr 02 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the final decision of the Commissioner is affirmed, and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/2/2024. (lej) (Docket entry modified on 4/2/2024 for administrative purposes.) (jbh)
GPO Apr 02 2024
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 16 Order that was entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/2/2024. (jbh)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
17 17 order Judgment - SSA Consent Order on Memorandum Order - SSA Consent Tue 04/02 2:19 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the16 Order that was entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/2/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
16 16 8 pgs motion Memorandum Order - SSA Consent Tue 04/02 2:06 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the final decision of the Commissioner is affirmed, and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/2/2024. (lej) (Docket entry modified on 4/2/2024 for administrative purposes.) (jbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
15 15 respoth Reply (Non Motion) Mon 04/01 12:57 PM
REPLY re14 Defendant's Brief (Social Security) by Tina L Weatherly. (Long, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
14 14 misc Defendant's Brief (Social Security) Mon 03/18 11:23 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration. (Tankard, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/01 8:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tankard, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 misc Plaintiff's Brief (Social Security) Fri 02/16 10:20 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Tina L Weatherly. Defendant Brief due by 3/18/2024 (Long, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/22 2:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Brief due by 2/21/2024. Defendant must file a brief within 30 days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/22/2024. (lej)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/22 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Martin W. Long on behalf of Tina L Weatherly (Long, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
9 9 misc Administrative Transcript (Social Security) Fri 01/19 2:06 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re2 Complaint filed by Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 11/27 1:13 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Defendant's motion to extend time to 1/19/2024 to file an answer6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/27/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
7 7 misc Deficiency Letter Fri 11/24 10:02 AM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that6 Motion for Extension of Time to File does not contain a statement that the movant contacted the adverse party with regard to the motion (Local Rule 6.2(b)). (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 11/20 5:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Certified Administrative Record in Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/25 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Preston on behalf of Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
4 4 order Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge Fri 09/22 10:20 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/22/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/22 8:49 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/22/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 09/20 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Tina L Weatherly. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/20 3:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tina L Weatherly. (llg)
Related: [-]