Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 3:23-cv-00195
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 3:15 AM CDT
Defendant
DMC LLC
Plaintiff
Aaron Hurst
Represented By
Christopher Wesley Burks
Wh Law
contact info

GPO Apr 09 2024
ORDER granting 5 motion for default judgment; entering Judgment in favor of Hurst and against DMC in the amount of $8,910 for actual wage damages, liquidated damages, and pre-judgment interest under the Fair Labor Standards Act and Arkansas Minimum Wage Act. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/9/2024. (jak)
GPO Apr 09 2024
DEFAULT JUDGMENT consistent with 6 Order, judgment is entered in favor of Aaron Hurst and against DMC, LLC in the amount of of $8,910 for actual wage damages, liquidated damages, and pre-judgment interest under the Fair Labor Standards Act and Arkansas Minimum Wage Act. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/9/2024. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
7 7 order Judgment - Default Tue 04/09 2:24 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT consistent with6 Order, judgment is entered in favor of Aaron Hurst and against DMC, LLC in the amount of of $8,910 for actual wage damages, liquidated damages, and pre-judgment interest under the Fair Labor Standards Act and Arkansas Minimum Wage Act. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/9/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 04/09 2:22 PM
ORDER granting5 motion for default judgment; entering Judgment in favor of Hurst and against DMC in the amount of $8,910 for actual wage damages, liquidated damages, and pre-judgment interest under the Fair Labor Standards Act and Arkansas Minimum Wage Act. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/9/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
5 5 motion Default Judgment Fri 03/22 8:51 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against DMC LLC by Aaron Hurst(Burks, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Aaron Hurst
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
4 4 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 01/30 10:02 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DMC LLC. (csf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
3 3 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/11 5:25 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default by Aaron Hurst (Burks, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Correction Wed 11/08 8:23 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re2 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include the party and date served as DMC LLC served on 10/4/2023 as marked on the document. (jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
2 2 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/07 11:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hurst. All Defendants. (Burks, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/20 2:25 PM
COMPLAINT against DMC LLC filed by Aaron Hurst. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON196. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service.(wbb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet