Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 4:23-cv-00877
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Oct 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 3:15 AM CDT
Defendant
America's Car-Mart
Plaintiff
Otis Watson, III
Post Office Box 673
Mabelvale, AR 72103

GPO Oct 03 2023
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 4 Order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/3/2023. (kdr)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
5 5 order Judgment Tue 10/03 3:13 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with4 Order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/3/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/03 3:07 PM
ORDER granting1 Otis Watson's motion to proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing without prejudice2 complaint for lack of jurisdiction. An in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/3/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/25 3:28 PM
NOTICE by Otis Watson, III. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 09/20 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against America's Car-Mart, filed by Otis Watson, III. (ajj)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/20 2:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Watson, III. (ajj)
Related: [-]