Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01471
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-23-876680-C
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Insperity Support Services, L.P.
Represented By
Mark J Ricciardi
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Michael Saldana
contact info
John M Orr
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Salomon
Represented By
James P. Kemp
Kemp & Kemp
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 09, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/09 9:24 AM
ORDER Granting16 Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
16 16 motion Stipulation Mon 02/05 3:20 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Plaintiff Michael Salomon. (Kemp, James) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 12/01 2:02 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 12/1/2023 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Pla Counsel: James P. Kemp, Esq.; Michael Salomon ; Def Counsel: Michael G. Saldana, Esq.; Mark J. Jacobs, Esq.; Lecia Chaney, Esq. ; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM - 12:15 PM ; (no image attached) The court met and conferred with the parties and counsel. A settlement agreement was not reached. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case returns to the normal litigation track.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
14 14 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 11/13 2:42 PM
ORDER granting13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/21/2024. Motions due by 4/22/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
13 13 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 11/09 12:49 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Insperity Support Services, L.P... (Orr, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
12 12 8 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/25 4:17 PM
ORDER granting11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Saldana for Insperity Support Services, L.P. and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to John M. Orr. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/25/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 10/25 12:34 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael G. Saldana and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John M. Orr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7471999) by Defendant Insperity Support Services, L.P.. (Orr, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
10 10 misc Status Report Fri 10/20 8:23 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendant Insperity Support Services, L.P... (Orr, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 10/03 3:28 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Insperity Support Services, L.P... (Orr, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
8 8 3 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Fri 09/29 11:22 AM
ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers - Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Thu 09/28 2:21 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, DEFENDANT INSPERITY SUPPORT SERVICES, L.P.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL SALOMON'S COMPLAINT filed by Insperity Support Services, L.P.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/8/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/12/2023.(Orr, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 23, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Sat 09/23 8:15 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Salomon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Sat 09/23 10:51 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Thu 09/21 11:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/21/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A.Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/6/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 09/21 10:26 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Insperity Support Services, L.P.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Orr, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Thu 09/21 10:19 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number A-23-876680-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7434248) by Insperity Support Services, L.P.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/1/2023. (Orr, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 09/21 11:09 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
notice ENE Notice Thu 09/21 11:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]