Arkansas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00224
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Sep 20, 2023
Defendant
Billy Ray Brooks
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Jul 11 2024
JUDGMENT as to Billy Ray Brooks. Count 1: 186 months for possession with intent to distribute and 24 months, consecutive, for committing the crime while on pretrial release. The total sentence to run concurrent in 4:20-cr-227-BRW; 5 year supervised released to run concurrent to 4:20-cr-227-BRW; and $100.00 special assessment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/11/2024. (rem)
GPO Jan 23 2025
ORDER denying 33 Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment as to Billy Ray Brooks. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2025. (bmd)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.