Arkansas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00235
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Sep 20, 2023
Defendant
Antonio Dozier
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Aug 09 2024
ORDER denying 47 Motion to Suppress and denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Antonio Dozier. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/9/2024. (rem)
GPO Jan 24 2025
JUDGMENT as to Antonio Dozier. Count 1: 96 months imprisonment; 3 years supervised release; and $100 special assessment fee. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/24/2025. (rem)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.