Original Case: 2:20-cv-01466

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02657
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Monday Sep 25, 2023 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
REPUBLIC STEEL CORP
Represented By
Savannah Fox
Nelson Mullins
contact info
Dustin B. Rawlin
Nelson Mullins
contact info
Seth J. Linnick
Nelson Mullins
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DEEMAC SERVICES LLC
Represented By
Daniel B. McLane
Duane Morris
contact info
Thomas E. Sanchez
Duane Morris
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2023 4:26 AM EDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Republic Steel in District Court No. 2-20-cv-01466. (PDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order dated 012523
Att: 3 22 pgs District Court Memorandum dated 081023
Att: 4 1 pgs District Court Judgment
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 6 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (PDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK ORDER The above captioned appeals are hereby consolidated for the purposes of scheduling, the filing of a single brief, reply brief, and joint appendix by the appellant, and for disposition. The appellees are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. The appellees may choose to file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). The parties are further advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document.. 23-2657 23-2658 (PDB)
Related: [-]