Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Billy Roy Wilson
Referred: Benecia B Moore
Case #: 3:23-cv-00196
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:0405 Review of HHS Decision
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:May 14, 2024
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO May 14 2024
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 15 today's Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that Judgment be entered for Plaintiff Billy Gene Staggs, reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding this case to the Commissioner for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 5/14/2024. (kdr)
GPO Jul 24 2024
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees; plaintiff is awarded $7,350.00 in attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/24/2024. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 07/24 9:18 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Attorney Fees; plaintiff is awarded $7,350.00 in attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/24/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
17 17 motion Attorney Fees Tue 07/23 11:04 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees (EAJA) by Billy Gene Staggs(Chermol, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Attorney Time Expended,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Tue 05/14 4:41 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with15 today's Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that Judgment be entered for Plaintiff Billy Gene Staggs, reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding this case to the Commissioner for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 5/14/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to Agency Tue 05/14 4:35 PM
ORDER granting14 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings Pursuant to Sentence Four. This matter is reversed and remanded to the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration for further administrative proceedings. This is a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 5/14/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Remand to Agency Tue 05/14 11:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Remand to SSA under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) by Social Security Administration (Tankard, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tankard, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
12 12 misc Plaintiff's Brief (Social Security) Wed 04/17 3:48 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Billy Gene Staggs. Defendant Brief due by 5/17/2024 (Chermol, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/19 3:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a brief in support of the allegations in the Complaint on or before 4/18/2024. Defendant must file a brief within 30 days of the date Plaintiff's brief is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 3/19/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Administrative Transcript (Social Security) Tue 03/19 10:17 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re2 Complaint filed by Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 01/22 11:32 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting the Commissioner's8 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record in Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff does not oppose the requested extension. The Commissioner's time to file the Certified Administrative Record is extended to, and including, March 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 1/22/2024. (bbg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 01/19 2:12 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Certified Administrative Record in Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 11/21 9:56 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Defendant moves for an extension of sixty (60) days to file their electronic Certified Administrative Record in Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. For good cause shown, the6 motion is granted. Defendant has until January 19, 2024, to file their answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 11/21/2023. (bbg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 11/20 3:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Certified Administrative Record in Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
5 5 misc Notice of Reassignment Thu 11/02 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. The Clerk's office has reassigned the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/2/2023.(jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/25 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Preston on behalf of Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/22 12:53 PM
ORDER granting1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Commissioner must file her answer and a certified copy of the administrative record on or before 11/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/22/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Billy Gene Staggs against Social Security Administration.(wbb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/21 2:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Gene Staggs. (wbb)
Related: [-]