Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:D P Marshall Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-00880
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal-Family & Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023
Case in other court:Ouachita County Circuit Court, 52CV-22-00210-4
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 3:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Julian Lott
Represented By
Sarah Cowan
Arkansas Municipal League
contact info
Amanda Marie LaFever
Arkansas Municipal League
contact info
Defendant
Camden, City of
Represented By
Sarah Cowan
Arkansas Municipal League
contact info
Amanda Marie LaFever
Arkansas Municipal League
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Wright Perrin
Represented By
Luther Oneal Sutter
Sutter & Gillham, PLLC
contact info
Lucien R. Gillham
Sutter & Gillham, PLLC
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2023
ORDER denying as moot 8 motion to transfer venue; granting 10 motion to remand; and remanding this case to the Circuit Court of Ouachita County, Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2023. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, December 07, 2023
18 18 misc Letter Thu 12/07 8:21 AM
LETTER to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Ouachita County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of the17 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 12/07 8:02 AM
ORDER denying as moot8 motion to transfer venue; granting10 motion to remand; and remanding this case to the Circuit Court of Ouachita County, Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2023. (jak)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 12/06 1:04 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. 14 , granted. Response, Doc. 14 -2, deemed filed. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2023. (slb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
15 15 brief Brief in Support Tue 11/21 6:51 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re14 Motion for Leave to File Response Out of Time filed by Camden, City of, Julian Lott.(Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Tue 11/21 6:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Response Out of Time by Camden, City of, Julian Lott (Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
misc Docket Note Thu 11/02 8:15 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Chief Judge D.P. Marshall Jr. Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/2/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/17 1:50 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Perrin's lawyer has informally advised there is no objection to motion, Doc. 12 . It is therefore granted. Response due by 30 October 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/2023. (slb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/16 5:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to Motion to Transfer by Camden, City of, Julian Lott (Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Correction Mon 10/02 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to8 Motion to Transfer Case.(jak)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 30, 2023
11 11 brief Brief in Support Sat 09/30 2:35 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re10 Remand to State Court and Response to Motion to Transfer filed by Amy Wright Perrin. (Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Remand to State Court Sat 09/30 2:34 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to Motion to Transfer by Amy Wright Perrin (Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
9 9 brief Brief in Support Mon 09/25 1:20 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re8 Transfer Case filed by Camden, City of, Julian Lott. (Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Transfer Case Mon 09/25 1:20 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Camden, City of, Julian Lott (Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Correction Fri 09/22 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 Notice of Removal,2 Complaint,3 Answer,4 Amended Complaint,5 Answer,6 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name as, "Camden, City of." (cmn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 utility Notice of Docket Correction Thu 09/21 1:49 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re6 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (missing case number) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry6 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Cowan on behalf of City of Camden, Julian Lott. (ldb) (jak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/21/2023) Main Document - Correct
5 5 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 09/21 11:40 AM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Camden, Julian Lott. (ldb)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/21 11:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Amy Wright Perrin against City of Camden, Julian Lott. (ldb)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/21 11:37 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by City of Camden, Julian Lott. (ldb)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Amy Wright Perrin against City of Camden, Julian Lott. (ldb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/21 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Camden, Julian Lott from Ouachita County Circuit Court, case number 52CV-22-210-4. Fee $402, receipt number LIT3637. (ldb) (Docket text modified on 9/21/2023 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet