Original Case: 1:18-cv-01432

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02715
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 3:23 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP
Represented By
David F. Herman
Armstrong Teasdale
contact info
Jeffrey P. Michalowski
Quarles & Brady
contact info
Daniella Gordon
Armstrong Teasdale
contact info
Travis R. Kearbey
Quarles & Brady
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HONG ZHUANG
Represented By
Hong Zhuang
contact info

GPO Mar 05 2024
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: BIBAS, PORTER and MONTGOMERY-REEVES, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 9. The parties' motions to seal their filings on appeal are granted; those filings will be sealed for 25 years. Zhuang's motion to file a supplemental appendix is granted to the extent that the motion includes a document that was part of the record before the District Court. To the extent that Zhuang seeks to expand the record on appeal, the motion is denied.

Docket last updated: 03/06/2024 3:23 AM EST
Thursday, September 21, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Hong Zhuang in District Court No. 1-18-cv-01432. (JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order 09/08/2023
Att: 3 1 pgs District Court Order 02/24/2023
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK)
Related: [-]