Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Referred: Jerome T Kearney
Case #: 4:23-cv-00882
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, June 10, 2024
25 25 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 06/10 4:05 PM
Filing fee received: $350.00 receipt number LIT6731. (adj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 03/15 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jesse L McCurley. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 03/14 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jesse L McCurley. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
22 22 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/04 1:03 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jesse L McCurley re21 Evidence. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/22 10:51 AM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/25 3:22 PM
NOTICE by Jesse L McCurley. (llg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
19 19 misc Request Fri 01/12 8:58 AM
REQUEST by Jesse L McCurley. (llg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/05 11:22 AM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (llg)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/05 11:10 AM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (llg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/02 1:37 PM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (csf)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/02 1:32 PM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (csf)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
14 14 utility Notice of Docket Correction Fri 12/29 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re13 Evidence. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of file mark) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry13 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/28 2:18 PM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (csf)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/28 1:50 PM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (csf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/27 4:03 PM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (csf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/19 11:23 AM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/27 10:58 AM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (ldb)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/27 10:24 AM
EVIDENCE by Jesse L McCurley. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Thu 11/16 1:04 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Status Update; directing the Clerk to reclassify this case as a "550" action; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/16/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
6 6 2 pgs motion Order Tue 11/14 9:21 AM
MOTION for Status Update by Jesse L McCurley. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/27 1:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by Jesse L McCurley.(kdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
4 4 5 pgs order Order Wed 09/27 2:14 PM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit an Amended Complaint for the Court's review within 30 days from the date of this Order, if he wishes; and directing the Clerk of the Court to mail Plaintiff a blank 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/27/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Wed 09/27 2:11 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pope County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/27/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Correction Fri 09/22 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (missing case number). The correct document was added to docket entry1 . (Copy of correct document attached hereto for service/review by the parties.) (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shane Jones, filed by Jesse L McCurley.(kdr) (kdr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/22/2023) Main Document - Correct
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/22 1:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse L McCurley. (kdr)
Related: [-]