Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Billy Roy Wilson
Case #: 4:23-cv-00883
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Sep 25, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 6:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
USA
Plaintiff
Jason Wayne Naillieux
620 Curtis Sykes Drive
North Little Rock, AR 72114


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
4 4 misc Mail Returned Wed 10/11 1:38 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jason Wayne Naillieux re3 Order. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/25 9:05 AM
ORDER dismissing this case; and finding moot1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/25/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT FOR A CIVIL CASE ALLEGING BREACH OF CONTRACT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jason Wayne Naillieux. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/22 4:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Wayne Naillieux. (jbh)
Related: [-]