Original Case: 2:22-cv-04360

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02732
Typecivil / united states as party / other civil
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 17, 2024 3:19 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Viveca D. Parker
Office of United States Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LESLIE RIVERA
Represented By
Michael T. van der Veen
van der Veen O'Neill Hartshorn & Levin
contact info
Nelson Levin
van der Veen O'Neill Hartshorn & Levin
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/17/2024 3:19 AM EST
Friday, September 22, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Leslie Rivera in District Court No. 2-22-cv-04360. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 11 pgs DC_Memo_072723
Att: 3 1 pgs DC_Order_072723
Att: 4 1 pgs Caption
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (ARR)
Related: [-]