California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:23-cv-01793
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 1:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Anduril Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Anton Metlitsky
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Adam J Karr
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
David Z. Cohen
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Natasha W. Teleanu
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Area-I, LLC
Represented By
Anton Metlitsky
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Adam J Karr
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
David Z. Cohen
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Natasha W. Teleanu
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Alley
Represented By
Matthew C Helland
Nichols Kaster LLP
contact info
Riley Palmer
Nichols Kaster Pllp
contact info
David Shimkin
Cozen O'Connor LLP
contact info
David Einer Schlesinger
Nichols Kaster Pllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
68 68 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Wed 03/05 1:09 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,66 filed by Nicholas Alley. CCA # 24-6184 Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mat)
Related: [-]