Min v. State University of New York at Albany et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas J Mcavoy |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-01201 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Brian Selchick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State University of New York at Albany
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Thorncroft
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (Mandatory Program)
Ira B. Lobel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Qilong Min
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/04/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order Removing Case from ADR
Mon 07/01 9:43 AM
TEXT ORDER Removing Case from ADR Program.AUTHORIZED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/1/2024. (jdc ) |
|
41 | 41
order
Order on Letter Request
Mon 07/01 9:37 AM
TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion40 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that: (1) the mandatory mediation Order22 is rescinded; (2) the deadline for completion of all discovery, including all depositions, is extended to 11/22/2024; (3) the deadline for filing of dispositive motions is extended to 1/22/2025; and (4) the parties are directed to file next status reports by 8/29/2024. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/1/2024. (jdc) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Fri 06/28 8:11 AM
Joint Letter Motion from Aimee Cowan for Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft requesting 120-day discovery and dispositive motion deadline extension submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Cowan, Aimee) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/20 9:21 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Notices [34, 35], Letter36 , and Response37 , Motion to Withdraw as Attorney32 is GRANTED. The Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2024 is no longer necessary and is therefore cancelled. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/20/2024. (jdc ) |
|
38 | 38
1
pgs
utility
Ex Parte Document
Thu 06/20 8:54 AM
Plaintiff's Ex Parte Letter to the Court filed by Qilong Min. (jdc ) (jdc, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 06/19 9:18 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft. (Cowan, Aimee) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
utility
Ex Parte Document
Tue 06/18 8:09 AM
Ex Parte Letter to the Court filed by Qilong Min. (jdc ) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 06/18 3:06 AM
NOTICE by Qilong Min re Substitution of Counsel (Coburn, Barry) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/17 12:54 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry Coburn on behalf of Qilong Min (Coburn, Barry) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Fri 06/14 12:37 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY : Clerk inadvertently filed a minute entry in this case that did not belong and has since deleted the entry. (jdc ) |
||
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 06/11 10:39 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney32 as filed by attorneys representing Plaintiff Min: (1) an on the record Hearing is scheduled 6/24/2024 at 12:00 p.m., In Person, in Binghamton, New York, before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric; (2) all counsel in this matter and Plaintiff Qilong Min are directed to appear in person at the Hearing; (3) no later than 6/18/2024, attorneys for Plaintiff are directed to file Ex Parte a letter, to be reviewed in camera by the Court, advising the Court as to the reasons for their Motion32 ; and (4) Defendants are directed to file a letter by 6/21/2024 advising whether they take any position regarding Motion32 . SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/11/2024. (jdc ) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 06/10 3:44 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Qilong Min. Response to Motion due by 7/1/2024 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment | ||
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
misc
Status Report
Wed 05/29 11:43 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft. (Cowan, Aimee) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Letter Request
Thu 04/11 8:46 AM
ORDER granting29 Letter Request. Attorney Hugh McKeegan terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/11/2024. (jdc ) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Wed 04/10 3:09 PM
Letter Motion from Hugh McKeegan for Qilong Min requesting Withdraw Appearance submitted to Judge Hon. Miroslav Lovric . (McKeegan, Hugh) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 03/12 3:06 PM
TEXT ORDER: On or before 5/31/2024, the parties shall file next status reports regarding the progress of discovery and the litigation. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/12/2024. (jdc ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 03/12 3:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: a status conference was held on 3/12/2024, via Teams teleconference. The Court reminded the parties as to the schedules and deadlines as set forth in Dkt. Nos. 21 & 22. The parties advised the Court as to the status and progress of discovery and the litigation. The parties are directed to file next status reports by 5/31/2024. Appearances: B. Fox, Esq., H. McKeegan, Esq., and K. Magnuson, Esq., for the Plaintiff; and A. Cowan, Esq., for the Defendants. (jdc ) |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
misc
Status Report
Tue 02/27 10:49 AM
STATUS REPORT by Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft. (Cowan, Aimee) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
adr
Stipulation Selecting Mediator
Wed 01/31 10:39 AM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Ira B. Lobel has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Hugh McKeegan, Aimee Cowan and. Dated: January 31, 2024(McKeegan, Hugh) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Letter Request
Thu 01/18 7:03 AM
TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion24 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that the deadline to select and report the selection of a mediator is extended to 1/31/2024. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/18/2024. (jdc ) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Wed 01/17 3:37 PM
Joint Letter Motion from Hugh McKeegan, Esq. for Qilong Min requesting Extension of Time to Identify a Mediator submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (McKeegan, Hugh) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
7
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 01/02 11:31 AM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft.(Cowan, Aimee) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation
Thu 12/21 9:37 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 1/17/2024. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 7/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/20/2023. (jdc ) |
|
21 | 21
order
Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order
Thu 12/21 9:37 AM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Joinder of Parties due by 2/20/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2024. Discovery due by 7/19/2024. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 4/22/2024. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 6/4/2024. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 6/19/2024. Motions to be filed by 9/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/20/2023. (jdc ) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/21 9:27 AM
TEXT ORDER: On or before 2/29/2024, the parties shall file status reports regarding the progress of the litigation. A telephone conference is scheduled for 3/12/2024 at 1:00 p.m. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with a Teams invite that contains the call-in information. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/20/2023.(jdc ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 12/21 9:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: an initial conference was held on 12/20/2023. Pretrial deadlines were discussed and set. A telephone conference is scheduled for 3/12/2024 at 1:00 p.m. Appearances: B. Fox, Esq. and K. Magnuson, Esq. for the Plaintiff and A. Cowan, Esq. for the Defendants. (jdc ) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 12/18 12:35 PM
***Answer due date updated for18 AMENDED COMPLAINT Brian Selchick answer due 1/2/2024; State University of New York at Albany answer due 1/2/2024; Christopher Thorncroft answer due 1/2/2024. (ztc) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
7
pgs
misc
Civil Case Management Plan
Tue 12/12 4:15 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Qilong Min. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
18 | 18
24
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 12/12 3:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft filed by Qilong Min.(Fox, Bruce) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
7
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/21 9:16 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft.(Cowan, Aimee) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/15 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aimee Cowan on behalf of Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft (Cowan, Aimee) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 11/10 11:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Supporting Documents served on the Office of the New York State Attorney General on 11/8/23, filed by Qilong Min. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only)
Wed 11/01 2:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Qilong Min. Brian Selchick served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only)
Wed 11/01 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Qilong Min. Christopher Thorncroft served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only)
Wed 11/01 2:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Qilong Min. State University of New York at Albany served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/26 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hugh McKeegan on behalf of Qilong Min (McKeegan, Hugh) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/26 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce C. Fox on behalf of Qilong Min (Fox, Bruce) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/20 9:57 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/20/2023. (jdc ) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/20 9:56 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/20/2023. (jdc) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 10/16 12:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/16/2023. (tab) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 10/16 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 12/21/2023 at 9:00AM is RESCHEDULED for 12/20/2023 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/13/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdc ) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/09 4:02 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bruce Fox Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6470781. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Magnuson, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Sponsor, | ||
Att: 2 Petition for Admission, | ||
Att: 3 Attorney E-Filing Registration Form and Oath of Admission, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
5 | 5
motion
Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/09 3:57 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hugh McKeegan Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6470779. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Magnuson, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Sponsor, | ||
Att: 2 Petition for Admission, | ||
Att: 3 Attorney E-Filing Registration Form and Oath of Admission, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admission Requirement
Tue 09/26 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff Qilong Min; Attorney Bruce C. Fox, Esq. and Hugh T. McKeegan, Esq., Email addresses are bruce.fox@obermayer.com and hugh.mckeegan@obermayer.com. Phone number is (412) 566-1500. Admissions due by 10/10/2023. (ztc) |
|
3 | 3
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Tue 09/26 10:55 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 12/21/2023 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/14/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/26 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to State University of New York at Albany.(ztc) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Summons issued as to Christopher Thorncroft, | ||
Att: 2 Summons issued as to Brian Selchick | ||
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/26 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Brian Selchick, State University of New York at Albany, Christopher Thorncroft (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6456740) filed by Qilong Min.(ztc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |