Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Referred: Jerome T Kearney
Case #: 2:23-cv-00200
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
James Davis

GPO Dec 07 2023
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 6 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2023. (ljb)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 11, 2023
10 10 misc Mail Returned Mon 12/11 4:11 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to James Davis re4 Order,5 Order. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
9 9 misc Mail Returned Fri 12/08 11:01 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to James Davis re3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
8 8 appeal Appellate Filing Fee Notice Thu 12/07 10:14 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Judgment 1983 Thu 12/07 10:10 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with6 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/07 10:04 AM
ORDER dismissing James Davis's complaint without prejudice because he has failed to amend it within the time allowed5 . An in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
5 5 4 pgs order Order Thu 11/02 8:14 AM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit an Amended Complaint for the Courts review within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk of the Court to mail Plaintiff a blank 1983 Complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/2/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Thu 11/02 8:11 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Crittenden County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/2/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/31 9:01 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Davis. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/28 1:40 PM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/28/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Does, filed by James Davis. (ldb)
Related: [-]