Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:D P Marshall Jr
Referred: Benecia B Moore
Case #: 3:23-cv-00197
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024
Defendant
Flossey Lane
Defendant
Joseph McCorkly
Defendant
Micheal Matlock
Defendant
Mylek Williams
Plaintiff
Zachary Ryan Parker

GPO Oct 03 2023
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying 1 IFP motion; directing the Clerk to send plaintiff a blank IFP motion; plaintiff must within 30 days of this Order either pay the $402 filing fee in full or file a complete IFP motion; directing prisoner officals to assist Plaintiff in completing the necessary forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/3/2023. (jak)
GPO Mar 15 2024
ORDER withdrawing the reference; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's complaint; and finding that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/15/2024. (jak)
GPO Mar 15 2024
JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Parker's complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/15/2024. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 28, 2024
16 16 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/28 10:36 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Zachary Ryan Parker re13 Order,14 Judgment,15 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
15 15 appeal Appellate Filing Fee Notice Fri 03/15 10:26 AM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Judgment 1983 Fri 03/15 10:21 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Parker's complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/15/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/15 10:20 AM
ORDER withdrawing the reference; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's complaint; and finding that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/15/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
12 12 misc Mail Returned Fri 03/08 12:33 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Zachary Ryan Parker re8 Order. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
11 11 misc Mail Returned Tue 02/27 8:09 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Zachary Ryan Parker re10 Order. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/05 12:04 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice of his current mailing address within 30 days of the date of this Order, if he wishes to continue pursuing this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 2/5/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Mon 01/29 11:11 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Zachary Ryan Parker re 1983 complaint form labeled Amended and Substituted Complaint. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
8 8 6 pgs order Order Tue 01/02 9:05 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Parker a § 1983 complaint form that is labeled "Amended and Substituted Complaint;" and allowing Parker to file, within 30 days of the date of this Order, an Amended and Substituted Complaint, containing the facts described in this Order, which are necessary to support his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 1/2/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
7 7 misc Notice of Reassignment Thu 11/02 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. The Clerk's office has reassigned the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/2/2023.(jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/24 2:19 PM
ORDER granting5 IFP motion; directing plaintiff's custodian to send monthly payments to the Clerk until a total of $350 has been paid; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Northeast Arkansas Community Correction Center and the appropriate ADC Offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/24/2023. (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/16 2:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zachary Ryan Parker. (wbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/03 3:43 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying1 IFP motion; directing the Clerk to send plaintiff a blank IFP motion; plaintiff must within 30 days of this Order either pay the $402 filing fee in full or file a complete IFP motion; directing prisoner officals to assist Plaintiff in completing the necessary forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/3/2023. (jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zachary Ryan Parker. (ldb)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Notice of Docket Correction Tue 09/26 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (missing case number) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/26 2:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zachary Ryan Parker. (ldb) (jak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/26/2023) Main Document - Correct