Original Case: 2:20-cv-18578

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02772
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
AM RETAIL GROUP INC
Defendant - Appellee
C. CARTER, Deputy of Unemployment Insurance- Appeal Tribunal
Represented By
Bryce K. Hurst
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Rimma Razhba
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAWN GARDENHIRE, Claims Examiner- Appeal Tribunal
Represented By
Bryce K. Hurst
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Rimma Razhba
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NANCY HUNT, Board of Review Member
Represented By
Bryce K. Hurst
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Rimma Razhba
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH SIEBER, Board of Review Member
Represented By
Bryce K. Hurst
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Rimma Razhba
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT
Represented By
Bryce K. Hurst
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Rimma Razhba
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AM RETAIL GROUP INC
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRIAN L. TAYLOR
Represented By
Brian L. Taylor
contact info

GPO Jul 01 2024
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: JORDAN, PORTER and PHIPPS, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 4. DLD-137

Docket last updated: 07/02/2024 5:10 AM EDT
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Brian L. Taylor in District Court No. 2-20-cv-18578. (TMM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 5 pgs DC Order 8/21/23
Att: 3 1 pgs caption
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (TMM)
Related: [-]