Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Case #: 4:23-cv-00889
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 4:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Doe
Plaintiff
Gene Edward Scott
4839 South Darrow Drive #G258
Tempe, AZ 85282

GPO Jul 09 2024
ORDER granting 1 Mr. Scott's motion to proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing without prejudice Mr. Scott's complaint against all defendants; and certifying an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/09/2024. (llg)
GPO Jul 09 2024
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 3 Order filed on this date, 2 plaintiff Gene Edward Scott's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. The Court certifies an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/09/2024. (llg)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
4 4 order Judgment Tue 07/09 11:34 AM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to3 Order filed on this date,2 plaintiff Gene Edward Scott's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. The Court certifies an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/09/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order Tue 07/09 11:27 AM
ORDER granting1 Mr. Scott's motion to proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing without prejudice Mr. Scott's complaint against all defendants; and certifying an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/09/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
misc Docket Note Thu 11/02 8:16 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Kristine G. Baker. Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/2/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 8:40 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Doe, filed by Gene Edward Scott. (jbh)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/27 8:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gene Edward Scott. (jbh)
Related: [-]