Castor et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04825 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-01062 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
RALPH CASTOR, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANA ALAN DICKERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SEAN DIEHL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES DIXON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN DOYON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KENNETH DRAEGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN DUART
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KENNETH DUNN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEORGE DUPORT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL DUREPO, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian DeVries
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BOBBY EAKINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS EBRITE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER EDMUNDS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL ALLEN EDWARDS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LANCE EGGEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIDGETTE EGGERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRYAN EGGERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN ELCHISAK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID ELLINGSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FREDDIE ELZEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DENNIS ESTES, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CARL EVERSOLE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Espinoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earl Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Evans
2362 Parsonage Road Apt 16-B
Charleston, SC 29414 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT FAIELLA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ELMORE FEAGIN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDRES FERNANDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL FIELD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY FILBECK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES F FITZGERALD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JARROD N FLAMING
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DENNIS FLETCHER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERNEST FLETCHER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM FLICKINGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CLAYTON FLOWERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN FONTENOT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEFFREY FORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARTHUR FORMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FREDERICK CHRISTOPHER FOX, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALVIN FRANCIS, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID FREESE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARTIN FREY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Fleming
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Fletcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Forbes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Franklin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN GANN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALLEN GARDNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANNIE GARLAND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BERNARD A. GARNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROY GARNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH GAULT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID GEISS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN GENGENBACH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AUGUSTO GIRON, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES GLEASON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALAN GLUCK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER GOLDSBERRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS GOULETTE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL R. GOWER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CARLOS GOYBURU
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERIC GRAGG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DELJUAN GRAHAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOUGLAS GRAHAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICK HERNANDEZ GRAHAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK GRANITO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN GRANNEMANN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER GRAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM ROBERT GREEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SPENCER BOYD GREENE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES GRIGGS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ENRIQUE GUERRERO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MIKE GUILFOYLE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GERALD GUMBS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD GUZICKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Garner, Jr.
248924 Limestone Correctional Facility 28779 Nick Davis Road
Harvest, AL 35749 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hector Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Officer John Guinn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOUGLIS MCARTHOR HAGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CALVIN HALFACRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARTELL HALL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES HAMPTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DONALD HARDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NOLAN HARRELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RONALD HARRELSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LC HASHAWAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL HAUG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEAN HAYES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID HEHOLT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DWAYNE HELFER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN HELLMERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ISRAEL HERRERA, JR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK HETT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GARY HICKS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HIESTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN HIETER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DARRYL HINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HAROLD HOAGLAND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CARMA HOBSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HORNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Henderson
227692 McCormick Correctional Institution 386 Redemption Way
McCormick, SC 29899 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hopkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leroy Howard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Douglass
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Dee George
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Gray
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
WAYNE DEROUIN
Terminated: 02/28/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LAMONT DUFFIE
Terminated: 10/27/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEITH FLAHERTY
Terminated: 10/23/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROY GRANT
Terminated: 10/11/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billy Pearce, Ronald Spontak Et al., Dennis W Pinner, Brian James Rizner Et al., William Callas, Mary Childress, Robert Clarke, Thomas Cortemeglia, Jr, Floro Delacruz, Robert Easterly, Robert J Zdenek Et al., Jermaine Odom, Brien Ott, John Owsiany, Wayne Redding, Randy Renfo, Joseph Michauskas Et al., John Belton Et al., ERNEST FLETCHER, ARTHUR FORMAN, Ray Taylor, John Walker, Richard Jimenez, Michael Tevere, Jr, Lee C Bethune, Henry L Book, Kenneth Shockley, Forrest Wayne Stewart, James Ouzts Et al., Larry Garner, Dennis Godwin, Steven E Hamburg, George Handrahan Ellis Bernard Hendricks as to Outzs, et al; George Anthony Jackson as to Ouzts, et al; Alfred Kithcart as to Ouzts, et al; Christopher Edward Landrum as to Ouzts, et al; Avery Matt Dalton as to Belton, et al; Eric Neal Greer as to Belton, et al; James Daniel Grumbles as to Belton, et al; Andre Jude Petit as to Rizner, et al; Gilbert Stewart Reilly as to Rizner, et al; Rickey David Reker as to Rizner, et al; Matthew Jackson Sapp, III as to Rizner, et al; Warren Ray Schatz as to Rizner, et al; Dean Stephen Silcott, Jr. as to Rizner, et al; Darrell Gene Smith as to Rizner, et al; Colin Harry Matte as to Spontak, et al; Richard Allen McDaniel as to Spontak, et al; Anthony Mercer as to Spontak, et al; John Lee Moulton as to Spontak, et al; Rex Wayne Nelson as to Spontak, et al; Skylar Matthew Wintemberg as to Zdenek, et al; David Coy as to Michauskas, et al; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Belton Et al., ALLEN GARDNER, ALAN GLUCK, RICK HERNANDEZ GRAHAM, John Guinn, NOLAN HARRELL, DANIEL HAUG, John W Graves, Robert Gutel, Ernest Theodore Gutierrez, Darrell Gene Hand, Sr, James D Harguth, David Harris, Glen Haws, Timothy Raymond Hedges, Wayne P Hockensmith, II, Dean Scott Hodge, Walter Edward Hayden, William Jeffery Hayes, Joe Nathan Henderson, Christopher Holloway, Zebulon Taylor Horton, William Berkeley Jones, Gordon Cyril Kelley, Edward Lopez King, James McKinley Langston, Lucian Doyle Lawley, John Roy Lott, Troy Edwin Lunsford, Booker T Magee, Roy Dewayne Massey, Richard Alan Mathews, Allan David Mattson, Ricky Wayne McCarthy, Joseph Gerard McElligott, Jr, Thomas M McWilliams, Michael Ralph Meadows, Lance Meyer Andre Lamonre Cunningham as to Belton, et al; Roy Lynn Dewalt as to Belton, et al; Morris Morrell Dickson as to Belton, et al; Bernett Dockter as to Belton, et al; Clifford Charles Farsje as to Belton, et al; Leo Cacait Felicitas as to Belton, et al; Owen William Ferguson, Sr. as to Belton, et al; Roger David Fields as to Belton, et al; Keith Allen Foster as to Belton, et al; Hubert A. Friedman as to Belton, et al; Willie Charles Fuller as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01746-RMG, 2:23-cv-01747-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG, 2:23-cv-06802-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/15 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Ingram, III, Heyward Jackson, Gary Lingle, Richard Lytle, GREGORY LOGAN, AUSTIN MILLER, Billy James Lewis, Jimmy Nelson Martinez, Glenn Martone, Roger Mason, Michael Mortimore, Herald Ortegon, John Palcsey, Justin Pfaltzgraff, Donn Rafferty, Anthony Savicki, William Scott, William Shetterly, Charles William Shipp, Larry Slater, George Smith, Janine Spears, William Watson, Norman Young, Larry Beemer Et al., Ricky Edward Anderson, John Bockerich, Larry Buck, James Buss, Bennie Ciccarello, Thomas Crowell, Jim Deming, RALPH CASTOR, JR, Earl Evans, ROBERT FAIELLA Antonio Hampton Lewis, Sr. as to Beemer, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/02 8:28 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Ouzts Et al., CHRISTOPHER EDMUNDS, JOHN ELCHISAK, FREDDIE ELZEY, CARL EVERSOLE, ELMORE FEAGIN, JR, PAUL FIELD, JAMES F FITZGERALD, CLAYTON FLOWERS, JOHN FONTENOT, FREDERICK CHRISTOPHER FOX, II, ALVIN FRANCIS, JR, DAVID FREESE, Curtis Fleming, Douglas Fletcher, Anthony Franklin, BERNARD A. GARNER, DAVID GEISS, AUGUSTO GIRON, JR, CHRISTOPHER GOLDSBERRY, THOMAS GOULETTE, MICHAEL R. GOWER, ERIC GRAGG, JOHN GRANNEMANN, WILLIAM ROBERT GREEN, JR, SPENCER BOYD GREENE, MIKE GUILFOYLE, GERALD GUMBS, RICHARD GUZICKI, Glenn Gray, Paul Green, DOUGLIS MCARTHOR HAGER, MARTELL HALL, CHARLES HAMPTON, DONALD HARDEN, LC HASHAWAY, ISRAEL HERRERA, JR, BRIAN HIETER, Paul Henderson Steven Russell Hardcastle as to Ouzts, et al; Kenneth Eugene Harrington as to Ouzts, et al; Scott Harris as to Ouzts, et al; Neal Hillyard as to Ouzts, et al; Charles Hoffman as to Ouzts, et al; David Gregory Hokanson as to Ouzts, et al; Kenneth John Honnick as to Ouzts, et al; Joseph Howard as to Ouzts, et al; Ronald L. Howe as to Ouzts, et al; John Fredrick Hubbard as to Ouzts, et al; Thomas Joseph Hurley as to Ouzts, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG, 2:23-cv-06792-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/02 8:07 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles Thomas, Luis Torres, Kenneth Towers, Lawrence Towsey, III, Darryl Tracy, Bobby Trimble, Richard Tucker, Jr, Charles Tuell, Terry Turner, Sam Urso, Steven J Valencik, Gerard Ventura, Pedrito Vicencio, Lester Walker, William Walker, Gary Wallace, Don Wantz, Jr, Rod Washington, Michael Waters, Thomas Weaver, Celester Webb, Lynn Weigt, Randall Weisberg, Willie Wharton, Stephen White, Earnest Lawson Whitt, Charles Wiggins, Jay Todd Wilbur, Kennth Wilcoxson, Albert Williams, Arvin Williams, Chet Williams, Donald Williams, Ronald Williams, Terrell Williams, Thomas Williams, Victor Williams, Wilford Williams, Terry Womack, Maurice Woods, Michael Yarbrough, Robert Yoder, Daniel Ziesmer, CHARLES DIXON, JOHN DOYON, KENNETH DRAEGER, JOHN DUART, GEORGE DUPORT, Howard Douglass, Robert Dyer WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04824-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/22 6:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by August J Matteis, Jr on behalf of ANDRES FERNANDEZ (Matteis, August) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 04/01 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOSEPH GAULT Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 02/28 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WAYNE DEROUIN WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/27 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LAMONT DUFFIE WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 10/23 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KEITH FLAHERTY WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Other
Thu 10/12 3:34 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO COUNSEL The scrivener's error as to Plaintiffs Douglass Howard and Gary Glenn have been corrected on this member case docket to Howard Douglass and Glenn Gray. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/11 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROY GRANT WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/11 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CARL GEORGE WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04825-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 09/27 3:31 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 9/27/2023), 2:23-cv-01062, Castor et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04825-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 09/27 2:56 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-01062. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/27 10:31 AM
ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/27/2023.] |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/27/2023.] | |
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER : Defendant 3M Company's "Unopposed Initial Motion For Extension Of Time" (Doc.3 ) is GRANTED . Defendant's responsive pleading now is due on or before the 28th day after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 8/15/2023. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/27/2023.] | |
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint,1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/27/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/27/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2023-902328.00., filed by 3M Company.(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/27/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RALPH CASTOR, JR. et al. (Deemed filed 7/7/2023 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit A).(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/27/2023.] | ||
Filing Fee received in the amount of $402.00, Credit Card receipt_number AALNDC-4405130, NDAL receipt #B6907. (Radney, W) Modified on 8/15/2023 (JLC). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 9/27/2023.] |