Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-00895
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 3:17 AM CDT
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Jay A. Ebelhar
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Russ Vandersteeg
Represented By
Stephen E. Whitehead
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Taffiny S. Stewart
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Burgess
Represented By
Tyler Mlakar
Rose Law Firm
contact info
Nancy Anne Smith
Rose Law Firm
contact info
David P. Martin
Rose Law Firm
contact info

GPO Apr 23 2024
ORDER denying 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/23/2024. (ldb)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
77 77 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/23 12:44 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER canceling the jury trial scheduled to begin April 28, 2025. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/23/2025. (kog)
Related: [-]